This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2021 at 07:42:45 (UTC).

Fredricks v. Saul

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Fredricks filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04087

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tania M. Fredricks

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Interested Party

Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven R. Pfeiffer

Attorney at Steven R. Pfeiffer, Prof. LLC

2522 West 41St Street, Suite 340

Sioux Falls, SD 57105

Defendant Attorneys

Meghan K. Roche

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Alison J. Ramsdell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Interested Party Attorney

Office of General Counsel - Dallas

Attorney at Social Security Administration

Suite 340, 1301 Young Street, Mailroom 104

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/11/2021. (DJP) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to Andrew Saul. Attorney Meghan K. Roche added.. (Roche, Meghan) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Roche, Meghan) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (FILED IN ERROR) Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to Andrew Saul. Attorney Meghan K. Roche added. Attorney Alison J. Ramsdell terminated. (Roche, Meghan) Modified Docket Text on 6/30/2021 (DLC). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons, AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/11/2021. (DJP) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tania M. Fredricks. (DJP) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Tania M. Fredricks on 5/11/2021. (DJP) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven R. Pfeiffer