This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2021 at 10:49:43 (UTC).

Fredrick v. City of Brunswick et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Fredrick filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against City of Brunswick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dante G. Fredrick

Brunswick, GA 31520

Defendants

Detective Daniel Merritt

City of Brunswick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sean K. Scally

Attorney at Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland

P.O. Box 220, 5 Glynn Avenue

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland

P.O. Box 220, 5 Glynn Avenue

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. (Scally, Sean) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Invoke Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Amend Complaint by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 1/6/2021. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dante G. Fredrick. (MG) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Invoke Supplemental Jurisdiction by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/28/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time re #7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due 12/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/8/2020. (MG) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time, by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/21/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt.(Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

7 #1

Briefs

#7

(#11) ORDER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. Plaintiff is to file a response either opposing or indicating his lack of opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/18/2020. (MG) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#6

(#6) Statement of Motions Pending at Tim of Removal. (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt Notice to plaintiff of filing Removal (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) REMOVAL Notice To All Counsel Of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Brunswick answer due 11/23/2020; Daniel Merritt answer due 11/23/2020. Pending Motions due by 11/30/2020. (ca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#2

(#2) CONSENT to Removal of Civil Action by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. (ca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#3) REMOVAL Notice To All Counsel Of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Brunswick answer due 11/23/2020; Daniel Merritt answer due 11/23/2020. Pending Motions due by 11/30/2020. (ca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. (Scally, Sean) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Invoke Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Amend Complaint by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 1/6/2021. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dante G. Fredrick. (MG) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Invoke Supplemental Jurisdiction by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/28/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 12/22/2020. (MG) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time re #7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due 12/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/8/2020. (MG) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time, by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/21/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 12/2/2020. (MG) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. Plaintiff is to file a response either opposing or indicating his lack of opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/18/2020. (MG) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Scheduling Notice Setting: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Discovery due by 4/5/2021. Motions due by 5/5/2021. Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2021. (MG) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (MG) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt.(Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. Responses due by 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs)(Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Motions Pending at Tim of Removal. (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt Notice to plaintiff of filing Removal (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt (Strickland, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REMOVAL Notice To All Counsel Of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Brunswick answer due 11/23/2020; Daniel Merritt answer due 11/23/2020. Pending Motions due by 11/30/2020. (ca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT to Removal of Civil Action by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. (ca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CE20-01043. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2965707), filed by City of Brunswick, Daniel Merritt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Kenneth Scally

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard K. Strickland