This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:38:54 (UTC).

Fredin v. City Pages et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Fredin filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against City Pages. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and Donovan W. Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00472

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

Donovan W. Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brock Fredin

Baldwin, WI 54002

Defendants

Michael Mullen

City Pages

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brock Fredin re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin, #1 Complaint. (lmb) Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit(s)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brock Fredin re #8 Receipt, #9 MOTION to Adjust Filing Fee and Exempting PLRA (JLB) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JLB) Document QC'd on 4/10/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#8

(#8) RECEIPT number 34641015508 in the amount of $59.05 issued to Brock Fredin. (JLB) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

2 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Letter MOTION to Adjust Filing Fee and Exempting PLRA filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(JLB) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER denying #9 Motion; granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. The application to proceed in forma pauperis of plaintiff Brock Fredin (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED.2. Fredin must submit a properly completed Marshal Service Form (Form USM-285) for each defendant. If Fredin does not complete and return the Marshal Service Forms within 30 days of this order, it will be recommended that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Marshal Service Forms will be provided to Fredin by the Court.3. After the return of the completed Marshal Service Forms, the Clerk of Court is directed to seek waiver of service from each of the defendants, consistent with Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.4. If a defendant fails without good cause to sign and return a waiver within 30 days of the date that the waiver is mailed, the Court will impose upon that defendant the expenses later incurred in effecting service of process. Absent a showing of good cause, reimbursement of the costs of service is mandatory and will be imposed in all cases in which a defendant does not sign and return a waiver of service form. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(2).5. Fredin's motion to adjust filing fee (ECF No. 9) is DENIED.6. Fredin must pay the unpaid balance ($290.95) of the statutory filing fee for this action in the manner prescribed by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), and the Clerk of Court shall provide notice of this requirement to the authorities at the institution where Fredin is confined.7. All prior consistent orders remain in full force and effect. 8. Failure to comply with any provision of this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/25/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/14/2019. (HAM) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER in Response to #6 Letter to Magistrate Judge. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff Brock Fredin must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $59.05 within 20 days of the date of this order.2. Should Fredin fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute.3. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order and the Court's March 14, 2019 Order (ECF No. #5 ) to Fredin at the following address: Ramsey County Correctional Facility, 297 Century Boulevard, Maplewood, Minnesota 55119. The Clerk of Court shall also update Fredin's address on the docket.4. Fredin shall promptly update the Court with his new address upon his release from the Ramsey County Correctional Facility.5. Fredin's request to stay this matter is hereby DENIED without prejudice.6. All prior consistent orders remain in full force and effect. 7. Failure to comply with any provision of this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/22/2019. (JRE) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Leung. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/28/2019. (las) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against City Pages, Michael Mullen filed by Brock Fredin. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Plaintiff. Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER denying #9 Motion; granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. The application to proceed in forma pauperis of plaintiff Brock Fredin (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED.2. Fredin must submit a properly completed Marshal Service Form (Form USM-285) for each defendant. If Fredin does not complete and return the Marshal Service Forms within 30 days of this order, it will be recommended that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Marshal Service Forms will be provided to Fredin by the Court.3. After the return of the completed Marshal Service Forms, the Clerk of Court is directed to seek waiver of service from each of the defendants, consistent with Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.4. If a defendant fails without good cause to sign and return a waiver within 30 days of the date that the waiver is mailed, the Court will impose upon that defendant the expenses later incurred in effecting service of process. Absent a showing of good cause, reimbursement of the costs of service is mandatory and will be imposed in all cases in which a defendant does not sign and return a waiver of service form. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(2).5. Fredin's motion to adjust filing fee (ECF No. 9) is DENIED.6. Fredin must pay the unpaid balance ($290.95) of the statutory filing fee for this action in the manner prescribed by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), and the Clerk of Court shall provide notice of this requirement to the authorities at the institution where Fredin is confined.7. All prior consistent orders remain in full force and effect. 8. Failure to comply with any provision of this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/25/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brock Fredin re #8 Receipt, #9 MOTION to Adjust Filing Fee and Exempting PLRA (JLB) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter MOTION to Adjust Filing Fee and Exempting PLRA filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(JLB) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RECEIPT number 34641015508 in the amount of $59.05 issued to Brock Fredin. (JLB) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER in Response to #6 Letter to Magistrate Judge. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff Brock Fredin must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $59.05 within 20 days of the date of this order.2. Should Fredin fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute.3. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order and the Court's March 14, 2019 Order (ECF No. #5 ) to Fredin at the following address: Ramsey County Correctional Facility, 297 Century Boulevard, Maplewood, Minnesota 55119. The Clerk of Court shall also update Fredin's address on the docket.4. Fredin shall promptly update the Court with his new address upon his release from the Ramsey County Correctional Facility.5. Fredin's request to stay this matter is hereby DENIED without prejudice.6. All prior consistent orders remain in full force and effect. 7. Failure to comply with any provision of this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/22/2019. (JRE) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JLB) Document QC'd on 4/10/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/14/2019. (HAM) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Leung. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/28/2019. (las) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (AKL). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brock Fredin re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin, #1 Complaint. (lmb) Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against City Pages, Michael Mullen filed by Brock Fredin. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Plaintiff. Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.