This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2020 at 10:20:54 (UTC).

Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. v. XTO Energy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against XTO Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd.

Defendant

XTO Energy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric E. Holm

John Paul Albert

Reagan E. Bradford

Brady L. Smith

Ryan K. Wilson

Defendant Attorneys

W. Scott Mitchell

Elizabeth L. Tiblets

 

Court Documents

#24

#22

#21

#20

18 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order Admitting Elizabeth Tiblets

18 #1

Affidavit Exh. A - Declaration of Elizabeth Tiblets

#18

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time

#17

5 #1

Affidavit of Brady L. Smith

#5

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order Admitting Reagan E. Bradford Pro Hac Vice

4 #1

Affidavit of Reagan E. Bradford

#4

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order Admitting John Paul Albert Pro Hac Vice

3 #1

Affidavit of John Paul Albert

#3

#2

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. (Holm, Eric) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#23) Remark - PHV attorney Elizabeth Tiblets is now a registered e-filer. (JEH) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Elizabeth T. Tiblets regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. (HEG) Modified on 11/30/2020 copy of letter emailed to PHV counsel (HEG). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by December 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/30/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Elizabeth L. Tiblets to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Ms. Tiblets within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, files a pleading acknowledging her admission under the terms set forth above. Copy of order emailed to PHV counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/30/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy J. Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electroncially mailed to counsel Eric E. Holm, John Paul Albert, Reagan E. Bradford, Brady L. Smith, Ryan K. Wilson, W. Scott Mitchell. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/17/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION Elizabeth L. Tiblets to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2579646.) W. Scott Mitchell appearing for Defendant XTO Energy, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exh. A - Declaration of Elizabeth Tiblets, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Admitting Elizabeth Tiblets) (Mitchell, W.) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint W. Scott Mitchell appearing for Defendant XTO Energy, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time) (Mitchell, W.) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Mitchell on behalf of XTO Energy, Inc. (Mitchell, W.) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. and Entry of Appearance of Ryan Wilson (Wilson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Clerk of Court Letter from Clerk of Court notifying attorney Reagan E. Bradford of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Copy e-mailed to R. E. Bradford) (JDH) (JDH) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Clerk of Court Letter from Clerk of Court notifying attorney John Paul Albert of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Copy emailed to J.P. Albert) (JDH) (JDH) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - John Paul Albert ; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Reagan E. Bradford ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Brady L. Smith ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Ryan K. Wilson Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/9/2020. (Copy to each attorney by email.) (JDH) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION Ryan K. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2569763.) Eric E. Holm appearing for Plaintiff Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan K. Wilson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Ryan K. Wilson Pro Hac Vice) (Holm, Eric) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION Brady L. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2569759.) Eric E. Holm appearing for Plaintiff Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brady L. Smith, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Brady L. Smith Pro Hac Vice) (Holm, Eric) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION Reagan E. Bradford to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2569754.) Eric E. Holm appearing for Plaintiff Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reagan E. Bradford, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Reagan E. Bradford Pro Hac Vice) (Holm, Eric) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION John Paul Albert to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2569740.) Eric E. Holm appearing for Plaintiff Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Paul Albert, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admitting John Paul Albert Pro Hac Vice) (Holm, Eric) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2564450 (JDH) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to XTO Energy, Inc. (JDH) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against XTO Energy, Inc., filed by Fredericksburg Royalty, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less