This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2020 at 08:28:32 (UTC).

Fredell v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Fredell filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00358

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wayne Fredell

Defendants

Equifax Information Services LLC

Credit One Bank, N.A.

TransUnion LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karl S. Gwaltney

Attorney at Maginnis Law, PLLC

4801 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 310

Raleigh, NC 27612

John C. Distasio

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, Tampa, P.A.

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Joshua R. Kersey

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, Tampa, P.A.

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Lewis P. Perling

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree St. Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Colin Dailey

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

301 S. College Street, Suite 3900

Charlotte, NC 28202

Heidi E. Siegmund

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

800 East Canal Street, Gateway Plaza

Richmond, VA 23219

Jarrod D. Shaw

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

260 Forbes Avenue, Suite 1800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Margaret Kane Thies

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

201 N. Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Robert Cowan deRosset, IV

Attorney at Young, Moore & Henderson, P.A.

3101 Glenwood Ave., Ste. 210, Po Box 31627

Raleigh, NC 27622

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joshua R. Kersey is admitted to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/20/2020. (maf) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

24 #1

Proposed Order

#24

(#24) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua R. Kersey Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4392905. by Wayne Fredell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gwaltney, Karl). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Lewis P. Perling for Equifax Information Services LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/12/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Dailey, Colin) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

21 #1

Exhibit A (Lewis Perling Court Admissions)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lewis P. Perling Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4382284. by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Lewis Perling Court Admissions))(Dailey, Colin). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Fredell. TransUnion LLC served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Distasio, John) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Fredell. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/11/2020. (Distasio, John) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC (Dailey, Colin) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 2/11/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Defendant) is GRANTED and Defendants deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is EXTENDED through and including February 11, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/17/2020. (kkb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Dustin Whelchel Dailey on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Dailey, Colin) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added John C. Distasio for Wayne Fredell. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/02/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, TransUnion LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added John C. Distasio for Wayne Fredell. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/02/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Dailey, Colin) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice to Joshua R. Kersey pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/27/2020. (maf) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joshua R. Kersey is admitted to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/20/2020. (maf) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua R. Kersey Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4392905. by Wayne Fredell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gwaltney, Karl). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Lewis P. Perling: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/19/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Lewis P. Perling for Equifax Information Services LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/12/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 3/4/2020. (kby) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Dailey, Colin) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lewis P. Perling Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4382284. by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Lewis Perling Court Admissions))(Dailey, Colin). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Fredell. TransUnion LLC served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Distasio, John) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Fredell. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/11/2020. (Distasio, John) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Kane Thies on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A. (Thies, Margaret) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 2/11/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Defendant) is GRANTED and Defendants deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is EXTENDED through and including February 11, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/17/2020. (kkb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC (Dailey, Colin) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Dailey, Colin). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Dustin Whelchel Dailey on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Dailey, Colin) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added John C. Distasio for Wayne Fredell. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/02/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, TransUnion LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John C. Distasio Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4313003. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John C. Distasio Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4313003. by Wayne Fredell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gwaltney, Karl) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4312900), filed by Wayne Fredell. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Gwaltney, Karl) Modified to correct text from "against All Plaintiffs" to "against All Defendants" on 12/23/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less