This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:31:24 (UTC).

Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd et al v. Seneca Sense Technologies Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Seneca Sense Technologies Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02167

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd

Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd.

Defendant

Seneca Sense Technologies Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Andrew North Cook

Attorney at K & L Gates (DC)

1601 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1600

Amanda Maxfield

Attorney at K&l Gates Llp

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Jeffrey R. Gargano

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

Devon Beane

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP (IL-NA)

70 W. Madison St, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

Devon Curtis Beane

Attorney at K&l Gates Llp

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Jeffrey Gargano

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP (IL-NA)

70 W. Madison St, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

Amy Jo Eldridge

Attorney at K & L Gates (DC)

1601 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1600

Karon Fowler

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (IL-NA)

110 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

James Kevin Fee

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP (DC)

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Michael J. Abernathy

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Scott D. Sherwin

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' status report #37 , the Court sets initial case management dates as follows: Defendant shall respond to the complaint by 7/25/22 and the parties shall complete the initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) within the timeframe specified by LPR 2.1. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

37 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Comprehensive Case Schedule

37 #37

Main Document

#36

(#36) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. by Amanda Maxfield (Maxfield, Amanda) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#35

(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. by Devon Curtis Beane (Beane, Devon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#34

(#34) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. by Jeffrey R. Gargano (Gargano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 6/9/2022, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary,individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#32

(#32) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seneca Sense Technologies Inc. by Scott D. Sherwin (Sherwin, Scott) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#31

(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seneca Sense Technologies Inc. by Michael J. Abernathy (Abernathy, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#30

No Description Available

29 #1

*Restricted*

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' status report #37 , the Court sets initial case management dates as follows: Defendant shall respond to the complaint by 7/25/22 and the parties shall complete the initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) within the timeframe specified by LPR 2.1. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Comprehensive Case Schedule)(Gargano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. by Amanda Maxfield (Maxfield, Amanda) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. by Devon Curtis Beane (Beane, Devon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. by Jeffrey R. Gargano (Gargano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 6/9/2022, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary,individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seneca Sense Technologies Inc. by Scott D. Sherwin (Sherwin, Scott) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seneca Sense Technologies Inc. by Michael J. Abernathy (Abernathy, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on David Lennarz of Registrar Corp. on 1/27/2022, filed by Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd.. (Eldridge, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Seneca Sense Technologies Inc. (swil) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2022: #1 Summons Notice) (swil, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, additional summons to effect service on defendant at Montreal location by Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd.. (Eldridge, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Seneca Sense Technologies Inc. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase transferred in from Newport News Division. Case Number 4:21-cv-155. (aott) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd. re #1 Complaint, Form AO 120 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Eldridge, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd.. (Eldridge, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd. (Eldridge, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd.. (Eldridge, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8145868.), filed by Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd, Simavita (Aust.) Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eldridge, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/26/2022.] (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Abernathy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott D. Sherwin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Kevin Fee