This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:25:09 (UTC).

Frazier v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Frazier against South Carolina Department of Corrections in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02384

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Thomas E Rogers, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Willie Frazier

Willie Benard Frazier

Willie Bernard Frazier

Defendants

South Carolina Department of Corrections

Bryan Stirling

Warden Ford

Eric Bittenger

Luetinant Borem

Officer Kimbrell

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Supporting Documents

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against South Carolina Department of Corrections, Officer Kimbrell, Luetinant Borem, filed by Willie Frazier. Service due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Eric Bittenger, Warden Ford, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Bryan Stirling, filed by Willie Frazier. Service due by 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#20

(#20) THIRD PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/09/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/03/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#11

(#11) SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/20/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

15 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #20 Third Proper Form Order w/NEF, (3)Summons and (3)USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Willie Frazier, #219272, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) THIRD PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/09/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against South Carolina Department of Corrections, Officer Kimbrell, Luetinant Borem, filed by Willie Frazier. Service due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • (#14) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Willie Frazier, #219272, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, ) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #11 Second Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/20/2019.(dsto, ) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #11 Second Proper Form Order w/NEF and Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Willie Frazier, #219272, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/20/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Willie Frazier. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #6 Proper Form Order w/NEF, AO240 and Fin.Certificate, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Willie Frazier, #219272, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/03/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Eric Bittenger, Warden Ford, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Bryan Stirling, filed by Willie Frazier. Service due by 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less