This case was last updated from PACER on 03/03/2020 at 07:53:37 (UTC).

Frazier v. MDOW Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Frazier filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MDOW Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Frazier

Pine Bluff, AR 71603

Defendant

MDOW Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Stuart P. Miller

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

4206 J.B. Hunt Drive, Suite 200

Rogers, AR 72758

David Koehler

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/27/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/03/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by MDOW Insurance Company.(bmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Donald Frazier with Jury Demand against MDOW Insurance Company. (bmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MDOW Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-19-728. Fee $400 receipt number LIT075461. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/27/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/03/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by MDOW Insurance Company.(bmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Donald Frazier with Jury Demand against MDOW Insurance Company. (bmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MDOW Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-19-728. Fee $400 receipt number LIT075461. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.