This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 07:56:16 (UTC).

Frazier v. Garda CL Technical Service, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Frazier filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Garda CL Technical Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is C. DARNELL JONES, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01467

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

C. DARNELL JONES, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Frazier

Defendants

Gardaworld Cashlink, LLC

Garda CL Technical Service, Inc.

Garda World Security Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARC I. SIMON

Attorney at SIMON & SIMON PC

1818 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

CHARLES E. WILLIAMS

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY

Two Liberty Place, 50 S 16Th Street, Suite 3200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES E. WILLIAMS on behalf of Anthony Frazier (WILLIAMS, CHARLES) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Frazier re: n/a served Summons and Complaint upon Garda CL Technical Service, Inc. by Certified Mail. Garda CL Technical Service, Inc. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Garda CL Technical Service, Inc., Garda World Security Corporation, Gardaworld Cashlink, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/29/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Garda CL Technical Service, Inc., Garda World Security Corporation, Gardaworld Cashlink, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15015465.), filed by Anthony Frazier.(SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDA CL TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDAWORLD CASHLINK LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDA WORLD A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARC I. SIMON