This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 08:49:45 (UTC).

FRAZIER v. ARCONIC, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 FRAZIER filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against ARCONIC, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01512

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERNANDO FRAZIER

Defendant

ARCONIC, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J. Allen

Attorney at Pond Lehocky Stern Giordano

2005 Market St, 3Rd Flr Ste 350

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant Attorneys

Gerri L. Sperling

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 2200, Four Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Adam J. Tragone

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Four Gateway Center, Suite 2200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FERNANDO FRAZIER. ARCONIC, INC. waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Allen, Matthew) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARCONIC, INC.. (Tragone, Adam) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerri L. Sperling on behalf of ARCONIC, INC.. (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Tragone on behalf of ARCONIC, INC.. (Tragone, Adam) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/25/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ARCONIC, INC. (sdp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ARCONIC, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5370585), filed by FERNANDO FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FERNANDO FRAZIER. ARCONIC, INC. waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Allen, Matthew) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARCONIC, INC.. (Tragone, Adam) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerri L. Sperling on behalf of ARCONIC, INC.. (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Tragone on behalf of ARCONIC, INC.. (Tragone, Adam) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/25/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to ARCONIC, INC. (sdp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ARCONIC, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5370585), filed by FERNANDO FRAZIER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arconic Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerri L. Sperling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam J. Tragone