This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:46:17 (UTC).

Frausto v. Southwest Airlines

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Frausto against Southwest Airlines in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04718

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Frausto

Defendant

Southwest Airlines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfonso Kennard

Attorney at Kennard Hernandez PC

2603 Augusta Drive, Suite 1450

Houston, TX 77057

Connica Lemond

Attorney at Kennard Hernandez PC

2603 August Drive, Suite 1450

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Lang Myers

6545 Winton Street

Dallas, TX 75214

Samantha Barlow Martinez

Attorney at Martinez Law Firm, PLLC

325 Heights Blvd

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#13

(#13) Case transferred in from Texas Northern. Case Number 3:19-cv-01059; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 12/04/2019)

13 #1

*Restricted*

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/3/2019) (mla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by Southwest Airlines (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Samantha Barlow Martinez added to party Southwest Airlines(pty:dft) (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Special Order 3-333: Effective September 3, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Brantley Starr's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter X. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/27/2019) (cea) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#10

(#10) REPLY filed by Southwest Airlines re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit(s)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE filed by Samuel Frausto re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit(s)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samuel Frausto. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines. (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#6

(#6) Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Connica Lemond terminated. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/14/2019) (epm) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Connica Lemond filed by Samuel Frausto (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Case transferred in from Texas Northern. Case Number 3:19-cv-01059; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/3/2019) (mla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Special Order 3-333: Effective September 3, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Brantley Starr's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter X. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/27/2019) (cea) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY filed by Southwest Airlines re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE filed by Samuel Frausto re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samuel Frausto. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines. (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by Southwest Airlines (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Samantha Barlow Martinez added to party Southwest Airlines(pty:dft) (Martinez, Samantha) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Connica Lemond terminated. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/14/2019) (epm) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Connica Lemond filed by Samuel Frausto (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Southwest Airlines filed by Samuel Frausto. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9961493) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s)) (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.