This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2019 at 07:55:46 (UTC).

Frasier et al v. Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Frasier filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00631

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melanie Frasier

Batman Express Train, LLC

Defendants

Frank Fowlkes

Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas H. Benton, Jr.

Attorney at Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield, LLCl

5 Dauphin Street, Suite 301

Mobile, AL 36602

Defendant Attorneys

Allan Sidney Jones

Attorney at Carr Allison

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

Paul M. James, Jr.

Attorney at Rushton, Stakely, Johnston & Garrett, P.A.

P.O. Box 270

Montgomery, AL 36101

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#19

(#19) Brief filed by Batman Express Train, LLC, Melanie Frasier re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Batman Express Train, LLC, Melanie Frasier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Benton, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Benton, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Batman Express Train, LLC. (Benton, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC, Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Blackboard Holdings, Inc., American International Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blackboard Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company for Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC.. (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Supplement Amended and Restated Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC Amended and Restated from Mobile, case number 2019-902169. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2479615, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended and Restated Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Defendant Frank Fowlkes' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Frank Fowlkes. (James, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. James, Jr on behalf of Frank Fowlkes (James, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Order for Blackboard to file an amended Notice of Removal, as set out and to file a disclosure statement. Disclosure Statement Due 9/19/2019; Amended Notice of Removal deadline set for 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/12/19. (cmj) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Jones, Allan) Modified on 9/16/2019 (tgw). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC from Circuit Court of Mobile, AL, case number 19-902169. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2474190, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Jones, Allan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #19 Brief to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. (cmj) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Brief filed by Batman Express Train, LLC, Melanie Frasier re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Batman Express Train, LLC, Melanie Frasier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Benton, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Benton, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER on #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Batman Express Train, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/8/2019. (Anthony, Porcha) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #15 filed by Batman Express Train, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Batman Express Train, LLC. (Benton, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • (#14) TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Batman Express Train, LLC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Mon. 10/7/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/30/2019. (ctn) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC, Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Blackboard Holdings, Inc., American International Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blackboard Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company for Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC.. (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#9) TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Blackboard Insurance Company is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Fri. 9/27/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/2019. (ctn) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Evidentiary Material Exhibit A to Answer to Complaint filed by Frank Fowlkes. (James, Paul) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC Amended and Restated from Mobile, case number 2019-902169. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2479615, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended and Restated Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant Frank Fowlkes' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Frank Fowlkes. (James, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. James, Jr on behalf of Frank Fowlkes (James, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order for Blackboard to file an amended Notice of Removal, as set out and to file a disclosure statement. Disclosure Statement Due 9/19/2019; Amended Notice of Removal deadline set for 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/12/19. (cmj) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Jones, Allan) Modified on 9/16/2019 (tgw). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Answer due from Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC and Frank Fowlkes pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC from Circuit Court of Mobile, AL, case number 19-902169. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2474190, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Jones, Allan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant