This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2020 at 07:04:04 (UTC).

Fraser v. Team Health Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Fraser filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Team Health Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04600

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sia Fraser

Defendant

Team Health Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben Michael Harrington

Attorney at Hagens Berman

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Craig L. Briskin

Attorney at Justice Catalyst Law

718 7Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Craig R. Spiegel

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Brian James Shearer

Attorney at Justice Catalyst Law

718 7Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Hannah W Brennan

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

55 Cambridge Pkwy, Suite 301

Cambridge, MA 02142

Craig Ripley Spiegel

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Rio S. Pierce

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Bruce Blocker

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn St., Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Jaime Allyson Bartlett

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Chelsea B. Davis

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Matthew Patrick Henry

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Carol Lynn Thompson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-1715

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Withdrawal of Chelsea Davis as Counsel by Team Health Holdings, Inc. (Davis, Chelsea) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting AS MODIFIED #25 Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint and Briefing Schedule. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER by Judge Jeffrye S. WHite granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Mark Blocker. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Response to Complaint and Briefing Schedule filed by Team Health Holdings, Inc., Sia Fraser. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 8/13/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Team Health Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tennessee Parent, Inc for Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Mark B. Blocker (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14811780) filed by Team Health Holdings, Inc. (Blocker, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea B. Davis (Davis, Chelsea) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Patrick Henry (Henry, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Allyson Bartlett (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Lynn Thompson (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Team Health Holdings, Inc. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/15/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 07/14/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sia Fraser.. (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Team Health Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14677642.). Filed bySia Fraser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 7/10/2020) Modified on 7/16/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEAM HEALTH HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carol Lynn Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark B. Blocker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaime Allyson Bartlett