This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2023 at 08:34:27 (UTC).

FRANTATORO et al v. GRABATO et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 FRANTATORO filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against GRABATO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and William J. Martini. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

William J. Martini

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOE FRANTATORO

CHRIS MARINAKOS

KERRY NEWBERT

SIDNEY REISS

HELEN REISS

NICK WILLIAMS

JOHN RIZZO

Defendants

REY E. GRABATO, II

DANIEL O'BRIEN

THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO

ARTHUR SCUTARO

ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, SR.

ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, JR.

OLENA BUDINSKA

IVEL TURNER

JEFF ROSENBERG

MARK KORCZAK

BYRON CARTOZIAN

BRIAN HARRINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY S. GRAIFMAN

Defendant Attorney

JOHN C. WHIPPLE

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, Extending Time to Answer by DANIEL O'BRIEN. (WHIPPLE, JOHN) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. BYRON CARTOZIAN served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. BRIAN HARRINGTON served on 2/8/2023, answer due 3/1/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. DANIEL O'BRIEN served on 1/30/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #13

Summons For Brian Harrington

1 #12

Summons For Byron Cartozian

1 #11

Summons For Mark Korczak

1 #10

Summons For Jeff Rosenberg

1 #9

Summons For Ivel Turner

1 #8

Summons For Olena Budinska

1 #7

Summons For Arthur Scutaro, Jr.

1 #6

Summons For Arthur Scutaro, Sr.

1 #5

Summons For Arthur Scutaro

1 #4

Summons For Thomas Nicholas Salzano

1 #3

Summons For Daniel O'Brien

1 #2

Summons For Rey E. Grabato II

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against OLENA BUDINSKA, BYRON CARTOZIAN, REY E. GRABATO, II, BRIAN HARRINGTON, MARK KORCZAK, DANIEL O'BRIEN, JEFF ROSENBERG, THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO, ARTHUR SCUTARO, ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, IVEL TURNER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13939095) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons For Rey E. Grabato II, #3 Summons For Daniel O'Brien, #4 Summons For Thomas Nicholas Salzano, #5 Summons For Arthur Scutaro, #6 Summons For Arthur Scutaro, Sr., #7 Summons For Arthur Scutaro, Jr., #8 Summons For Olena Budinska, #9 Summons For Ivel Turner, #10 Summons For Jeff Rosenberg, #11 Summons For Mark Korczak, #12 Summons For Byron Cartozian, #13 Summons For Brian Harrington)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, Extending Time to Answer by DANIEL O'BRIEN. (WHIPPLE, JOHN) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. BYRON CARTOZIAN served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. BRIAN HARRINGTON served on 2/8/2023, answer due 3/1/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. DANIEL O'BRIEN served on 1/30/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, JR served on 2/3/2023, answer due 2/24/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. ARTHUR SCUTARO served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION and ORDER extending the deadline for Defendant ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUATRO, JR. to file and serve a response to the Complaint through and including 4/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/22/2023. (dam) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, Extending Time to Answer by ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, JR. (SCHAEL, COURTNEY) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DANIEL O'BRIEN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/6/2023. (dam) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Daniel O'Brien. Attorney JOHN C. WHIPPLE for DANIEL O'BRIEN added. (WHIPPLE, JOHN) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and ORDER extending the time for Defendant BYRON CARTOZIAN to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint through 2/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/9/2023. (dam) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION For Extension Of Time To Answer The Complaint by JOE FRANTATORO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, KERRY NEWBERT, HELEN REISS, SIDNEY REISS, JOHN RIZZO, NICK WILLIAMS. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing of Investor Certifications: Certification of Joe Frantantoro, Chris Marinakos, Kerry Newbert, Helen & Sidney Reiss, John Rizzo, and Nick Williams on behalf of JOE FRANTATORO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, KERRY NEWBERT, HELEN REISS, SIDNEY REISS, JOHN RIZZO, NICK WILLIAMS Re #1 Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Chris Marinakos Pursuant To PSLRA, #2 Certification Of Helen & Sidney Reiss Pursuant To PSLRA, #3 Certification Of Joe Fratantoro Pursuant To PSLRA, #4 Certification Of John Rizzo Pursuant To PSLRA, #5 Certification Of Kerry Newbert Pursuant To PSLRA, #6 Certification Of Nick Williams Pursuant To PSLRA)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) Modified on 1/22/2023 (dam, ). (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to OLENA BUDINSKA, BYRON CARTOZIAN, REY E. GRABATO, II, BRIAN HARRINGTON, MARK KORCZAK, DANIEL O'BRIEN, JEFF ROSENBERG, THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO, ARTHUR SCUTARO, ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, JR, ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, SR, IVEL TURNER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OLENA BUDINSKA, BYRON CARTOZIAN, REY E. GRABATO, II, BRIAN HARRINGTON, MARK KORCZAK, DANIEL O'BRIEN, JEFF ROSENBERG, THOMAS NICHOLAS SALZANO, ARTHUR SCUTARO, ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTARO, IVEL TURNER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13939095) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHN RIZZO, CHRIS MARINAKOS, JOE FRANTATORO, NICK WILLIAMS, KERRY NEWBERT, SIDNEY REISS, HELEN REISS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons For Rey E. Grabato II, #3 Summons For Daniel O'Brien, #4 Summons For Thomas Nicholas Salzano, #5 Summons For Arthur Scutaro, #6 Summons For Arthur Scutaro, Sr., #7 Summons For Arthur Scutaro, Jr., #8 Summons For Olena Budinska, #9 Summons For Ivel Turner, #10 Summons For Jeff Rosenberg, #11 Summons For Mark Korczak, #12 Summons For Byron Cartozian, #13 Summons For Brian Harrington)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less