This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:54:09 (UTC).

Franks v. Transfinancial Companies Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Franks filed an Other lawsuit against Transfinancial Companies Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02889

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cadece Franks

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Transfinancial Companies, Inc.

Equifax Information Services LLC

Transfinancial Companies Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samantha Joanne Orlowski

Attorney at Halvorsen Klote

680 Craig Road, Suite 104

St Louis, MO 63141

Joel Spencer Halvorsen

Attorney at Halvorsen Klote

680 Craig Road, Suite 104

St Louis, MO 63141

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Nichols Wariner

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2600 Dallas Parkway, Suite 600

Frisco, TX 75034

Anna K Olin

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Transfinancial Companies Inc ; served on 1/21/2020. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#6

(#6) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Anna K Olin added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Olin, Anna) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 12/30/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Transfinancial Companies Inc. (cdt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cadece Franks. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B - Updated Credit Report

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Dispute Letters

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Transfinancial Companies, Inc. filed by Cadece Franks. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10462166) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Dispute Letters, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Transfinancial Companies Inc ; served on 1/21/2020. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's response to the complaint is due 2/11/2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/22/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Anna K Olin added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Olin, Anna) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 12/30/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Transfinancial Companies Inc. (cdt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cadece Franks. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Transfinancial Companies, Inc. filed by Cadece Franks. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10462166) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Dispute Letters, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less