This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 09:32:56 (UTC).

Franklin v. Weisler et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Franklin filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Weisler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04805

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Franklin

Defendants

HP Inc.

Carl Bass

Margaret C. Whitman

Charles Bergh

Rajiv L Gupta

ROBERT R. BENNETT

Shumeet Banerji

Catherine A. Lesjak

Stacy Brown-Philpot

Stacey Mobley

Tracy Keogh

Aida Alvarez

Dion J. Weisler

Stephanie A. Burns

Subra Suresh

Enrique Lores

Mary Anne Citrino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Brian Michael Lutz

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Verification

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

*Restricted*

#7

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #8 Stipulation TO STAY. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY filed by Aida Alvarez, ROBERT R. BENNETT, Shumeet Banerji, Carl Bass, Charles Bergh, Stacy Brown-Philpot, Stephanie A. Burns, Mary Anne Citrino, Rajiv L Gupta, HP Inc., Tracy Keogh, Catherine A. Lesjak, Enrique Lores, Stacey Mobley, Subra Suresh, Dion J. Weisler, Margaret C. Whitman and Scott Franklin. (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2021) Modified on 7/1/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:21-cv-00703. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (nms) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SO ORDERED, Granting #3 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Transfer of Action. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/22/2021. (nms) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Transfer of Action by Scott Franklin. (Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Aida Alvarez, Shumeet Banerji, Carl Bass, Robert R. Bennett, Charles Bergh, Stacy Brown-Philpot, Stephanie A. Burns, Mary Anne Citrino, Rajiv L. Gupta, Tracy Keogh, Catherine A. Lesjak, Enrique Lores, Stacey Mobley, Subra Suresh, Dion J. Weisler, Margaret C. Whitman - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3617194.) - filed by Scott Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HP, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst