This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:00:23 (UTC).

Franklin et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Franklin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03160

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jerald R Franklin

Denise Franklin

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J. Diamond

Attorney at Goldberg and Osborne - Tucson

698 E Wetmore Road, Suite 200

Tucson, AZ 85705

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Denise Franklin, Jerald R Franklin. (Diamond, David) (KEP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-134) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16671317 filed by Jerald R Franklin, Denise Franklin. (Diamond, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16671317. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1805-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01805. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Arizona, 19-1805, Franklin et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 19-3160 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 134 cc: JPMDL (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01805. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-134) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16671317. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1805-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Denise Franklin, Jerald R Franklin. (Diamond, David) (KEP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16671317 filed by Jerald R Franklin, Denise Franklin. (Diamond, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.