This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2020 at 08:48:08 (UTC).

Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Fun F/X II, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fun F/X II, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Damon R Leichty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

CAO Enterprises II, LLC

Fun F/X II, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford S Moyer

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney PC - Kal/MI

950 Trade Centre Wy Ste 310

Kalamazoo, MI 49002

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Christina) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Eshoo, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford S Moyer on behalf of Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #4

Proposed Summons to CAO Enterprises II

1 #3

Proposed Summons to Fun FX II, Inc.

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against CAO Enterprises II, LLC, Fun F/X II, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4125784.), filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Fun FX II, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to CAO Enterprises II)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Christina) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Eshoo, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CAO Enterprises II, LLC, Fun F/X II, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #1 Revised Summons with corrected date) (shk). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (shk) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford S Moyer on behalf of Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against CAO Enterprises II, LLC, Fun F/X II, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4125784.), filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Fun FX II, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to CAO Enterprises II)(Moyer, Bradford) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford S. Moyer