This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:45:48 (UTC).

Frankel v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Frankel filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Nicholas P. Mizell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00868

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karyn Frankel

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonas H. Kushner

Attorney at Kushner & Kushner

2121 W First St, Po Box 2200

Ft Myers, FL 33902

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/27/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/13/2019. (MLJ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER in re: courtesy paper copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/19/19. (drn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Affidavit of Indigency construed as a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this cause without prepayment of costs. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to prepare and forward the completed service documents along with sufficient copies of the Complaint to the Clerk for service by the United States Marshals Service. Upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Clerk, the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/6/2019. (brh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (drn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases is NOT per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Karyn Frankel. Related case(s): no (Kushner, Jonas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/27/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/13/2019. (MLJ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER in re: courtesy paper copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/19/19. (drn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#4) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (drn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Affidavit of Indigency construed as a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this cause without prepayment of costs. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to prepare and forward the completed service documents along with sufficient copies of the Complaint to the Clerk for service by the United States Marshals Service. Upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Clerk, the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/6/2019. (brh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Karyn Frankel. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Karyn Frankel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less