This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:45:50 (UTC).

Frank v. Paul

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Frank filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Paul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00484

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kent Frank

Yazoo City, MS 39194-5000

Defendants

Paul

Warden Paul

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

1 #7

Cover Letter

#4

(#4) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 08/22/19 (KNS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #5

Affidavit E - George Frank

1 #4

Affidavit D - Celia Frank

1 #9

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) ORDER, on or before August 12, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/11/2019. [Copy of Order and application mailed to Petitioner] (CS) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

1 #2

Affidavit B - Kevin Frank

1 #8

Envelope

1 #10

Notice of Assignment

1 #6

Affidavit F - Matthew Troccoli

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kent Frank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Kent Frank, #2 Affidavit B - Kevin Frank, #3 Affidavit C - Henry Morrison, #4 Affidavit D - Celia Frank, #5 Affidavit E - George Frank, #6 Affidavit F - Matthew Troccoli, #7 Cover Letter, #8 Envelope, #9 Notice of Assignment (KNS) (copies of NEF and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff) (Additional attachment added on 7/10/2019: #10 Notice of Assignment) (KNS). Modified on 7/10/2019 (KNS). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #1

Affidavit A - Kent Frank

1 #3

Affidavit C - Henry Morrison

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this cause should be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice regarding the jurisdictional issue only and dismissed without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 08/22/19 (KNS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 08/22/19 (KNS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this cause should be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice regarding the jurisdictional issue only and dismissed without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 08/22/19 (KNS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Filing fee PAID: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643056074. (ND) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER, on or before August 12, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/11/2019. [Copy of Order and application mailed to Petitioner] (CS) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kent Frank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Kent Frank, #2 Affidavit B - Kevin Frank, #3 Affidavit C - Henry Morrison, #4 Affidavit D - Celia Frank, #5 Affidavit E - George Frank, #6 Affidavit F - Matthew Troccoli, #7 Cover Letter, #8 Envelope, #9 Notice of Assignment (KNS) (copies of NEF and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff) (Additional attachment added on 7/10/2019: #10 Notice of Assignment) (KNS). Modified on 7/10/2019 (KNS). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.