This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 09:09:58 (UTC).

Frank Mason v. Thomas P. Schmalzried et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Frank Mason filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Thomas P Schmalzried. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03308

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Mason

Defendants

Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated

Thomas P Schmalzried, M.D.

Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation

Yancey & Associates

Gib Yancey

DePuy, Inc.

DePuy Orthopedics, Inc.

DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.

DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Thomas P. Schmalzried M.D. A Professional Corporation

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mickel M. Arias

Attorney at Arias Sanguinetti Wang and Torrijos LLP

6701 Center Drive West 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Michael J. Cowgill

Attorney at Maglio Christopher and Toale PA

1605 Main Street, Suite 710

Sarasota, FL 34236

Robert M. Partain

Attorney at Arias Sanguinetti Wang and Torrijos, LLP

6701 Center Drive West Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant Attorneys

David C Allen

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William Choi

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kelley S Olah

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher P Norton

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.

2049 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ralph A Campillo

Attorney at Sedgwick LLP

801 South Figueroa Street 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5556

 

Court Documents

1 #17

Proof of Service - Johnson & Johnson

1 #16

Proof of Service - Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.

1 #15

Proof of Service - DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.

1 #14

Proof of Service - Gib Yancy

1 #13

Proof of Service - Yancy & Associates

1 #12

First Amended Complaint

1 #11

Amended Summons

1 #10

Notice and Acknowledgment - Thomas P Schmalzried, M.D.

1 #9

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Thomas P. Schmalzried APC

1 #8

Proof of Service - Yancey & Associates

1 #7

Proof of Service - Gib Yancey

1 #6

Notice of Case Assignment

1 #5

Summons on Complaint

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Complaint

1 #2

2 - Declaration of Gib Yancey

1 #1

1 - Declaration of Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D.

1 #1

Main Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,, #27 #40 filed by Plaintiff Frank Mason. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Cowgill, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,, #27 filed by Plaintiff Frank Mason. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Cowgill, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#39) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge George H. Wu. Docket Numbers 36 and 37 are stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #38 filed on July 5, 2022. File these documents as a Motion using the Motion for Reconsideration event, attach the document captioned Motion as the main document, and then have the Memorandum, Declaration and Proposed Order as attachments to that same docket entry. RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court, Order on Motion to Stay Case, #27 #36 , Notice of Motion, #37 (aco) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court, Order on Motion to Stay Case, #27 #36 , Notice of Motion, #37 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion for Reconsideration. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other: File these documents as a Motion using the Motion for Reconsideration event, attach the document captioned Motion as the main document, and then have the Memorandum, Declaration and Proposed Order as attachments to that same docket entry.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#37) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 07/05/2022. SEE DOCKET NO. 39] NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,, #27 #36 filed by Plaintiff Frank Mason. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Cowgill, Michael) Modified on 7/5/2022 (aco). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#36) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 07/05/2022. SEE DOCKET NO. 39] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,, #27 filed by Plaintiff Frank Mason. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Cowgill, Michael) Modified on 7/5/2022 (aco). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#35) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge George H. Wu. Docket Numbers 31 and 32 are stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notices [33 and 34] filed on June 30, 2022. Hearing date does not comply with Local Rule 6. RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court, Order on Motion to Stay Case, #27 #31 , Notice of Motion, #32 . (aco) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion, #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion for Reconsideration. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court, Order on Motion to Stay Case, #27 #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#32) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 07/01/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. 35] NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,, #27 #31 filed by Plaintiff Frank Mason. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Cowgill, Michael) Modified on 7/1/2022 (aco). (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE on First Amended Complaint Executed by Plaintiff Frank Mason, upon Defendant Gib Yancey served on 4/18/2022. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 04/27/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 14 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE on First Amended Complaint Executed by Plaintiff Frank Mason, upon Defendant Yancey & Associates served on 4/27/2022. in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT ON 04/27/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 13 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Does, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated, Thomas P Schmalzried, MD, Thomas P. Schmalzried M.D. A Professional Corporation, Gib Yancey, Yancey & Associates, filed by Plaintiff Frank Mason. [SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 12 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yancey & Associates, upon Defendant Yancey & Associates served on 3/15/2022 in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT ON 03/21/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 8 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Mason, upon Defendant Gib Yancey served on 3/15/2022. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT ON 03/21/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 7 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Does, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated, Thomas P. Schmalzried, Thomas P Schmalzried, MD, Gib Yancey, Yancey & Associates. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Frank Mason. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT 3 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D., #2 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 1, #3 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 2, #4 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 3, #5 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 4, #6 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 5, #7 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 6, #8 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 7, #9 Notice of Related Cases Orders, Part 8)(Olah, Kelley) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated, identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson. (Olah, Kelley) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated. (Olah, Kelley) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV06902 Receipt No: ACACDC-33306834 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 1 - Declaration of Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D., #2 2 - Declaration of Gib Yancey, #3 Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons on Complaint, #6 Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Proof of Service - Gib Yancey, #8 Proof of Service - Yancey & Associates, #9 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Thomas P. Schmalzried APC, #10 Notice and Acknowledgment - Thomas P Schmalzried, M.D., #11 Amended Summons, #12 First Amended Complaint, #13 Proof of Service - Yancy & Associates, #14 Proof of Service - Gib Yancy, #15 Proof of Service - DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., #16 Proof of Service - Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., #17 Proof of Service - Johnson & Johnson) (Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Medical Device Business Services, Incorporated(pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yancey and Associates is a litigant

Latest cases where Thomas P Schmalzried, M.D., a Professional Corporation (TPS Corp.) is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant