This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 11:22:47 (UTC).

Frank Delgadillo v. Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 Frank Delgadillo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00792

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Delgadillo

Defendants

Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd.

Ichiro Yamamoto

Hiromitsu Shimao

Hidetaka Inoue

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corey Alexander Hall

Attorney at The Hall Law Group

523 North Fairview Street

Santa Ana, CA 92703

Stephan M Brown

Attorney at The Bankruptcy Group PC

3300 Douglas Boulevard Suite 100

Roseville, CA 95661

Defendant Attorneys

Weiss Baryalai Hamid

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Willmore F Holbrow, III

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #17 . Responsive pleadings due 6/30/22. (twdb) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

17 #1

Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) DECLARATION of Corey A. Hall in Response to OSC Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution filed by Plaintiff Frank Delgadillo. (Hall, Corey) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #14 . Defendants have until 5/27/22 to file their responsive pleadings. (twdb) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/9/2022. (twdb) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on April 11, 2022. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on April 11, 2022. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (dca) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit A-5 Order Appointing International Process Server

1 #4

Exhibit A-4 Summary and Translated Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit A-3 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A-2 Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A-1 Summons

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #17 . Responsive pleadings due 6/30/22. (twdb) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Plaintiff Frank Delgadillo Frank Delgadillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hall, Corey) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Corey A. Hall in Response to OSC Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution filed by Plaintiff Frank Delgadillo. (Hall, Corey) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #14 . Defendants have until 5/27/22 to file their responsive pleadings. (twdb) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hiromitsu Shimao answer now due 5/27/2022; Ichiro Yamamoto answer now due 5/27/2022; Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd. answer now due 5/27/2022; Hidetaka Inoue answer now due 5/27/2022, filed by Defendants Hiromitsu Shimao; Ichiro Yamamoto; Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd.; Hidetaka Inoue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamid, Weiss) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/9/2022. (twdb) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on April 11, 2022. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on April 11, 2022. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (dca) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:22-cv-00792-DOC-KESx. (car) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Frank Delgadillo. Filed in State Court on 4/7/2022 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A-2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Ichiro Yamamoto, Hiromitsu Shimao, Hidetaka Inoue. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Takayoshi Kojima re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Hidetaka Inoue, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 30-2021-01201780-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-33094756 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Hiromitsu Shimao, Ichiro Yamamoto, Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd., Hidetaka Inoue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A-2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A-3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A-4 Summary and Translated Complaint, #5 Exhibit A-5 Order Appointing International Process Server) (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Hidetaka Inoue(pty:dft), Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Pal Group Holdings Company, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Hiromitsu Shimao(pty:dft), Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Ichiro Yamamoto(pty:dft))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willmore F Holbrow, III