This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2019 at 07:10:43 (UTC).

Frank D Ambrosio, M.D. v. Emily Fisher, et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Frank D Ambrosio, M D filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Emily Fisher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Consuelo B. Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00552

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank D Ambrosio

Defendants

Emily Fisher

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Diana Hughes Leiden

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543

Laura M Franco

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-5802

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Frank D Ambrosioto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #10 (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PLAINTIFFS FIRST AND FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, no later than February 25, 2019, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs first and fifth causes of action. See order for details. (shb) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (ys) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Frank D Ambrosio. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Emily Fisher. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Frank D'Ambrosio, M.D.. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frank D'Ambrosio, M.D.. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frank D'Ambrosio, M.D., (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23093027 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Frank D'Ambrosio, M.D.. (Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Frank D'Ambrosio, M.D.(pty:pla))(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura M Franco

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diana Hughes Leiden