This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 08:05:49 (UTC).

Franck v. Wright Medical Technology

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Franck filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dustin B. Pead and Robert J. Shelby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Dustin B. Pead

Robert J. Shelby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jon Paul Franck

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Bowman

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ELIZABETH BOWMAN, LLC

8 E Broadway #413

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Douglas B. Cannon

Attorney at FABIAN VANCOTT

215 S State St Ste 1200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2323

Defendant Attorneys

Elisabeth M. McOmber

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Dana J. Ash

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

30 S 17Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19103-1104

Anne A. Gruner

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

30 S 17Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Strike the Demand for Attorneys' Fees, #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#23

(#23) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Strike the Demand for Attorneys' Fees, #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Complaint 2:19-CV-00061 filed by Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck. (Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Propose Schedule and for Parties to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/7/2019. (jwt) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#21

(#21) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Propose Schedule and for Parties to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report until After Resolution of Defendant's Pending Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due no later than 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/5/19. (dla) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV - D Ash

6 #2

Return of Service

6 #1

State Court Complaint

#4

(#4) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck and Defendant Wright Medical Technology. Form due by 2/13/2019. (tlh) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck and Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (tlh) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket

2 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint, ROS Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th Distict Court, Provo County, case number 190400016, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3192015) filed by Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, ROS Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Strike the Demand for Attorneys' Fees, #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Strike the Demand for Attorneys' Fees, #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Complaint 2:19-CV-00061 filed by Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck. (Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Propose Schedule and for Parties to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/7/2019. (jwt) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Propose Schedule and for Parties to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report until After Resolution of Defendant's Pending Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due no later than 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/5/19. (dla) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana J. Ash for Wright Medical Technology. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/13/19. (dla) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ERRATA to #13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana J. Ash , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3202622, filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of D Ash)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana J. Ash, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3202622. The application for admission is not attached to the exhibit. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to file an errata linked to the original pleading with the application for admission attached. The Motion will not be ruled on until the application is submitted. (dla) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anne A. Gruner for Wright Medical Technology. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/12/19. (dla) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#10) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (las) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's MOTION to Strike the Demand for Attorneys' Fees filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days of this Order. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/30/2019. (las) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) File Received from Fourth Distirict Court -Provo Utah County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Return of Service) (las) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • (#5) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck. (las) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck and Defendant Wright Medical Technology. Form due by 2/13/2019. (tlh) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jon Paul Franck and Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (tlh) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th Distict Court, Provo County, case number 190400016, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3192015) filed by Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, ROS Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elisabeth M. McOmber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dana J. Ash

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne A. Gruner