This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 08:16:47 (UTC).

France v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 France filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey J. Helmick and Kathleen B. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02396

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

Referral Judge

Kathleen B. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelli L. France

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Theodore A. Bowman

Attorney at Gallon, Takacs & Boissoneault

3516 Granite Circle

Toledo, OH 43617

Leah O. Michael

Attorney at Gallon, Takacs & Boissoneault

3516 Granite Circle

Toledo, OH 43617

Defendant Attorneys

Cara Staley Rafferty

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Social Security Administration - Chicago

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Attachment A - Rule 16.3.1

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/23/20.(S,HR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/21/20. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 10/26/2020; by FedEx upon Commissioner of Social Security on 10/27/2020 and upon U.S. Attorney General on 10/27/2020 (marked C19) filed on behalf of Kelli L. France. Related document(s) #7 . (O,K) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Filing filed by Kelli L. France. (Bowman, Theodore) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Leah O. Michael filed by on behalf of Kelli L. France. (Michael, Leah) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Judge's Initial Order issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,HR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,HR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/23/20.(S,HR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/21/20. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/21/20. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kelli L France. Related document(s) #1 . (Bowman, Theodore) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kelli L France. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285) (Bowman, Theodore) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less