This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2020 at 10:35:52 (UTC).

France v. Bernstein

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 France filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Bernstein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01443

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Todd France

Respondent

Jason Bernstein

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Craig Crandall Reilly

Attorney at Law Office of Craig C. Reilly

111 Oronoco St

Alexandria, VA 22314

John David Folds

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC (DC)

901 K St Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

William J. Clements

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

1835 Market Street, Ste. 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael A. Iaconelli

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

1835 Market Street, Ste. 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John D Comerford

Attorney at Dowd Bennett LLP

7733 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1900

St. Louis, MO 63105

James B Martin

Attorney at Dowd Bennett LLP

7733 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1900

St. Louis, MO 63105

Scott L. Grenoble

Attorney at Buzgon Davis Law Offices

P.O. Box 49, 525 South 8Th Street

Lebanon, PA 17042

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #58 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply (and supporting memorandum of law) filed by Todd France.(Clements, William) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

58 #1

Exhibit(s) 1 - proposed Sur-Sur-Reply

#58

(#58) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply (and supporting memorandum of law) by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - proposed Sur-Sur-Reply)(Comerford, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

57 #5

Exhibit(s) 5

57 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

57 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

57 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

57 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#57

(#57) SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Clements, William) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #17

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #16

Exhibit 10

1 #15

Exhibit 9

1 #14

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 5a

1 #6

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1c

193 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #58 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply (and supporting memorandum of law) filed by Todd France.(Clements, William) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply (and supporting memorandum of law) by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - proposed Sur-Sur-Reply)(Comerford, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Clements, William) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER - AND NOW, on this 27th day of August 2020, upon consideration of Petitioner Todd France (Petitioner)s motion for leave to file a sur-reply brief (Doc. No. 48) in connection with the pending motion to vacate the arbitration award filed by Respondent Jason Bernstein (Respondent) (Doc. No. 27), and noting Respondents opposition thereto (Doc. No. 55), IT IS ORDERED THAT Petitioners motion (Doc. No. #48 ) is GRANTED, and Petitioner may file a sur-reply brief in accordance with all applicable Local Rules of this Court within seven (7) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/27/20. (dmn) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 52 deleted and refiled as Doc. 55. (pjr) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #48 MOTION For Leave to File Sur-Reply, #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Maxim email of July 15, 2020, #2 Exhibit(s) Iaconelli email of July 16, 2020 agreeing to Silver deposition, #3 Exhibit(s) Proof of service of Silver subpoena, #4 Exhibit(s) Maxim email of June 11, 2020, #5 Exhibit(s) Clements email of June 11, 2020)(Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, James Martin, John Comerford and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 52 using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott L. Grenoble on behalf of Jason Bernstein Attorney James Martin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5213266.. (Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott L. Grenoble on behalf of Jason Bernstein Attorney John Comerford is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5213211.. (Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Michael Anthony Iaconelli. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/5/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Joseph Clements. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/5/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Jason Bernstein (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Joseph Clements and Certification of Local Counsel John David Folds Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7186634. by Todd France. (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Anthony Iaconelli and Certification of Local Counsel John David Folds Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7186611. by Todd France. (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in Support of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, #2 Proposed Order)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd France Jason Bernstein served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020 (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Jason Bernstein. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, by Todd France. (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Todd France v. Jason Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7176815.), filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 1c, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5a, #8 Exhibit 5b, #9 Exhibit 5c, #10 Exhibit 6a, #11 Exhibit 6b, #12 Exhibit 6c, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.] (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Folds Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J. CLEMENTS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Crandall Reilly