This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 08:59:45 (UTC).

France v. Bernstein

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 France filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Bernstein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael S. Nachmanoff and Rossie D. Alston, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Presiding Judge

Rossie D. Alston, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Todd France

Respondent

Jason Bernstein

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John David Folds

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC (DC)

901 K St Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Respondent Attorney

Craig Crandall Reilly

Attorney at Law Office of Craig C. Reilly

111 Oronoco St

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

26 #2

Exhibit B

26 #1

Exhibit A

#26

(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

25 #1

Exhibit A

#25

(#25) Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Folds, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

24 #1

Proposed Order

#24

(#24) Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Folds, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#20) Request for Hearing by Jason Bernstein re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #13

Exhibit 7

1 #12

Exhibit 6c

1 #9

Exhibit 5c

1 #8

Exhibit 5b

1 #7

Exhibit 5a

1 #6

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

#1

(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, by Todd France. (Folds, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Folds, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Folds, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPer RDA chambers motions set for 6/5/2020 have been removed from the docket per Court's General Order 2020-12 - Date to be determined (clar, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Petitioner's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Folds, John) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice for James B. Martin. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/20/20. (acha, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice for John D. Comerford. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/20/2020. (acha, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (Per RDA chambers - BS) (clar, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Request for Hearing by Jason Bernstein re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James B. Martin and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7208193. by Jason Bernstein. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Joseph Clements. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/5/2020. (acha, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Jason Bernstein (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Joseph Clements and Certification of Local Counsel John David Folds Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7186634. by Todd France. (Folds, John) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Anthony Iaconelli and Certification of Local Counsel John David Folds Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7186611. by Todd France. (Folds, John) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in Support of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, #2 Proposed Order)(Folds, John) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd France Jason Bernstein served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020 (Folds, John) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Jason Bernstein. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, by Todd France. (Folds, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Todd France v. Jason Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7176815.), filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 1c, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5a, #8 Exhibit 5b, #9 Exhibit 5c, #10 Exhibit 6a, #11 Exhibit 6b, #12 Exhibit 6c, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folds, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Folds Esq.