This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2022 at 08:51:23 (UTC).

Foy v. Randall's Food & Drug LP

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 Foy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Randall's Food Drug LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02358

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Foy

Defendant

Randall's Food & Drug LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anwar Sadat Montgomery

Defendant Attorneys

Robyn M Wise

Michael P Sharp

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randall's Food & Drug LP. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sharp, Michael) Modified text on 10/20/2022 (mms). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robyn M Wise on behalf of Randall's Food & Drug LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wise, Robyn) Modified text on 10/20/2022 (mms). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/9/2022) (axm) (Entered: 12/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/9/2022) (axm) (Entered: 12/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robyn M Wise on behalf of Randall's Food & Drug LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wise, Robyn) Modified text on 10/20/2022 (mms). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randall's Food & Drug LP. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sharp, Michael) Modified text on 10/20/2022 (mms). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Randall's Food & Drug LP. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13239105) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Sharp, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten pdf on 10/20/2022) (mms). Modified text on 10/20/2022 (mms). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less