This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2022 at 09:37:59 (UTC).

Foy et al v. FedNat Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Foy filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FedNat Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00659

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon Foy

Giva Foy

Defendants

FedNat Insurance Co

Federated National Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian James Houghtaling

Attorney at Houghtaling Law Firm

3500 N Hullen St

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

Ethan N Penn

Attorney at Musgrave McLachlan & Penn

1555 Poydras St Ste 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Brent Joseph Carbo

Attorney at Musgrave McLachlan & Penn

1555 Poydras St Ste 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lindsey Marie Devereux

Attorney at Musgrave McLachlan & Penn

1555 Poydras St Ste 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FedNat Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5024141) filed by Brandon Foy, Giva Foy. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party Brandon Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party Giva Foy(pty:pla))(aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FedNat Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Foy, Giva Foy. FedNat Insurance Co served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FedNat Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Attorney Ethan N Penn added to party FedNat Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Penn, Ethan) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

5 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to Ethan N Penn on behalf of FedNat Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/15/2022. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FedNat Insurance Co. Corporate Parent - FedNat Holding Co to FedNat Insurance Co. (aty,Penn, Ethan) Modified to add corporate parent on 4/1/2022 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 04/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FedNat Insurance Co. Corporate Parent - FedNat Holding Co to FedNat Insurance Co. (aty,Penn, Ethan) Modified to add corporate parent on 4/1/2022 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to Ethan N Penn on behalf of FedNat Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/15/2022. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FedNat Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Attorney Ethan N Penn added to party FedNat Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Penn, Ethan) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Foy, Giva Foy. FedNat Insurance Co served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FedNat Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FedNat Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5024141) filed by Brandon Foy, Giva Foy. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party Brandon Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party Giva Foy(pty:pla))(aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federated National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDNAT Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian J. Houghtaling(Designation Retained)