1:22-CV-02552
05/13/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Copyright
Robert W. Gettleman
FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD
The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Company's, Partnerships, And Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
The Uzzle
All Star Toyz
Guangzhou Bestseller E-Commerce Co., Ltd. (1)
Yiwu Mumoni Bamboo& Wooden Products Co., Ltd. (2)
Yunhe Boge Handicraft Co., Ltd.(3)
Zhejiang Geduo Toys Co., Ltd. (4)
Zhejiang Taole Toys Co., Ltd.(5)
Baby footprint Store (6)
Baby Growthing Store (7)
BestVVip Store (8)
Breathing Lightly Store (9)
Brozebra Own Toy Store (10)
CC-C New world store (11)
Childhood Period Toy Store (12)
Dafa shop Store (13)
Di&zi Store (14)
Diikamiiok Official Store (15)
Doki Toy Store (16)
David Edward Hutchinson
Attorney at Thoits Law
47 W Polk Street, Ste 100 #221
Chicago, IL 60605
Christopher M. Tom
Attorney at Thoits Law
400 Main Street, Suite 250
Los Altos, CA 94022
Harry Moren
Attorney at Thoits Law
400 Main Street, Suite 250
Los Altos, CA 94022
Rola Daaboul
Attorney at Akerman
500 West 5Th Street, Suite 1210
Austin, TX 78701
Julia Renee Lissner
Attorney at Akerman LLP
71 S. Wacker Drive, 46Th Floor
Chicago, IL 60606
David M. Airan
Attorney at Leydig, Voit & Mayer, Ltd.
Two Prudential Plaza, 180 N. Stetson Ave. #4900
Chicago, IL 60601-6780
Nicole E. Kopinski
Attorney at Leydig, Voit & Mayer, Ltd.
Suite 4900, Two Prudential Plaza
Chicago, IL 60601
(#57) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Foxmind Canada Enterprises, Ltd of Defendant No. 77. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
(#56) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Foxmind Canada Enterprises, Ltd to the Sur-Reply of Defendants The Uzzle and All Star Toyz regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 07/08/2022)
(#55) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Foxmind Canada Enterprises, Ltd of Defendant No. 65. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Agreed motion to extend deadlines regarding Joybuy and Joybuy Express (Doe Defendants 88 and 89) #53 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading due on or before 8/1/2022. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/03/2022)
(#53) MOTION by Defendants Joybuy (88), Joybuy Express (89) for extension of time - AGREED Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Joybuy and Joybuy Express (Kopinski, Nicole) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
(#52) MOTION by Defendant shenzhenshiyingmeihongwanjuyouxiangongsi (96) to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and vacate the preliminary injunction order. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
RESTRICTED
(#50) MOTION by Defendant Fridja (84) to dismiss plaintiff's complaint and vacate the preliminary injunction order (exr, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
(#49) Surreply In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Star Toyz, Uzzle (79) (Daaboul, Rola) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
(#6) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AILNDC-19468241. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
(#5) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AILNDC-19468184. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
(#3) DOCUMENT by Plaintiff FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD Schedule A to Complaint (Hutchinson, David) Modified on 6/13/2022 (exr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2022)
(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Exhibit Schedule A Slip Sheet
Exhibit Exhibit 1
Main Document
Docket(#57) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Foxmind Canada Enterprises, Ltd of Defendant No. 77. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#56) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Foxmind Canada Enterprises, Ltd to the Sur-Reply of Defendants The Uzzle and All Star Toyz regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 07/08/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#55) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Foxmind Canada Enterprises, Ltd of Defendant No. 65. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Agreed motion to extend deadlines regarding Joybuy and Joybuy Express (Doe Defendants 88 and 89) #53 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading due on or before 8/1/2022. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#53) MOTION by Defendants Joybuy (88), Joybuy Express (89) for extension of time - AGREED Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Joybuy and Joybuy Express (Kopinski, Nicole) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#52) MOTION by Defendant shenzhenshiyingmeihongwanjuyouxiangongsi (96) to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and vacate the preliminary injunction order. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#51) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 27, 2022 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Order Number: 43556. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy_Bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2022. (Bistany, Nancy) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#50) MOTION by Defendant Fridja (84) to dismiss plaintiff's complaint and vacate the preliminary injunction order (exr, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#49) Surreply In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Star Toyz, Uzzle (79) (Daaboul, Rola) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 6/27/2022. The Uzzle and All Star Toyz's motion for leave to file surreeply in opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #44 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the surreply due by 7/8/2022. Plaintiff is directed to deliver plaintiff's and defendants' Uzzle and All Start Toyz's products to chambers by 7/11/2022. The parties are also directed to deliver colored copies of all of the briefs by 7/11/2022. Telephonic hearing set for 7/19/2022 at 10:30 a.m. Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (888) 684-8852 and using the access code is 1503395. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the telephone hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 06/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTDPlaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, including a Temporary Injunction, A Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Internet Stores, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTDPlaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AILNDC-19468241. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AILNDC-19468184. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) DOCUMENT by Plaintiff FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD Schedule A to Complaint (Hutchinson, David) Modified on 6/13/2022 (exr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, ) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, ) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by FOXMIND CANADA ENTERPRISES, LTD; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19467726. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Schedule A Slip Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
[-] Read Less