This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:55:13 (UTC).

FOX v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 FOX filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Lauren Fleischer Louis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24514

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Lauren Fleischer Louis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES FOX, JR

Defendants

Nissan North America, Inc.

AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC.

AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. a Florida Profit Corporation, doing business as Autonation Nissan Kendall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ernesto L. Santos, Jr.

Attorney at Jay Halpern & Associates

150 Alhambra Circle, Suite 1100

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Frank Brian Halpern

Attorney at Halpern Santos and Pinkert

501 Aragon Ave

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

John Carl Seipp, Jr.

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke, LLP

2 Alahambra Plaza, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33134

Carolina Sofia Pinero

215 Antilla Ave. Apt. 3, Coral Gables

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Christine L. Welstead

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

Suite 800, Two Alhambra Plaza

Miami, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Markel Arrizabalaga, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 4/8/2020 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Scheduling Mediation

#19

(#19) Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Nissan North America, Inc., Markel Arrizabalaga as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/8/2020 at 2:30 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Scheduling Mediation)(Seipp, John) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER STRIKING INITIAL DISCLOSURES re #17 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by JAMES FOX, JR Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#17

(#17) STRICKEN per Order DE#18 -Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 (a)(1) by JAMES FOX, JR (Santos, Ernesto) Modified on 12/10/2019 (drz). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ONE DEFENDANT, AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. (a Florida Profit Corporation,) re #14 Notice (Other) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#15

(#15) GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by JAMES FOX, JR of Voluntary Dismissal (Santos, Ernesto) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, .( Responses due by 11/27/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#6) NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CIRCUIT COURT DOCKET SHEET) (Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit F - STATE COURT DOCKET

1 #6

Exhibit E - NNA ANNUAL REPORT

1 #5

Exhibit D - NNA BUSINESS ENTITY INFORMATION

1 #4

Exhibit C - CARFAX REPORT

1 #3

Exhibit B - NNA'S SUBJECT VEHICLE HISTORY

1 #2

Exhibit A - COMPLAINT

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, .( Responses due by 11/27/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Markel Arrizabalaga, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 4/8/2020 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Nissan North America, Inc., Markel Arrizabalaga as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/8/2020 at 2:30 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Scheduling Mediation)(Seipp, John) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER STRIKING INITIAL DISCLOSURES re #17 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by JAMES FOX, JR Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STRICKEN per Order DE#18 -Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 (a)(1) by JAMES FOX, JR (Santos, Ernesto) Modified on 12/10/2019 (drz). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ONE DEFENDANT, AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. (a Florida Profit Corporation,) re #14 Notice (Other) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by JAMES FOX, JR of Voluntary Dismissal (Santos, Ernesto) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, .( Responses due by 11/27/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2020., Discovery due by 8/11/2020., Expert Discovery due by 8/11/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 1/21/2020., Mediation Deadline 8/25/2020., In Limine Motions due by 9/2/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2020., Motions due by 9/2/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/23/2020., Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 12/1/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/25/2020.)and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent AutoNation, Inc. for AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. (Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc. (Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER)(Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernesto L. Santos, Jr on behalf of JAMES FOX, JR. Attorney Ernesto L. Santos, Jr added to party JAMES FOX, JR(pty:pla). (Santos, Ernesto) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC.. Attorney John Carl Seipp, Jr added to party AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CIRCUIT COURT DOCKET SHEET) (Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA M. HUGHES) (Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Seipp, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER on Post-Removal Procedures and Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. (Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/22/2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12113037, filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B - NNA'S SUBJECT VEHICLE HISTORY, #4 Exhibit C - CARFAX REPORT, #5 Exhibit D - NNA BUSINESS ENTITY INFORMATION, #6 Exhibit E - NNA ANNUAL REPORT, #7 Exhibit F - STATE COURT DOCKET)(Seipp, John) Text Modified on 11/1/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less