Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:26:39 (UTC).

FOX v. MALINOWSKI et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 FOX filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MALINOWSKI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are A. Richard Caputo and Karoline Mehalchick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00651

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

A. Richard Caputo

Karoline Mehalchick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory C. Fox

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Defendants

Laccawanna County

Terri Somer

TROOPER Robert Malinowski

C.O. Owens

 

Court Documents

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory C. Fox.(ga) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#15

(#15) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 05/29/2019. Order to Superintendent/Warden and a copy to plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Abeyance by Gregory C. Fox.(ao) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory C. Fox.(ga) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#12

(#12) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ga) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Application To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (ga) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#9

(#9) DISCOVERY filed by Gregory C. Fox. (ao) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDMENT by Gregory C. Fox. (ao) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Stay by Gregory C. Fox.(ao) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

6 #1

285 Service Packet with IFP Notice

#6

(#6) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(ao) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

5 #1

IFP (CIVIL RIGHTS)

#5

(#5) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 04/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (CIVIL RIGHTS))(lp) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01378. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE FORTHWITH TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTERICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/8/19. 4/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gregory C. Fox. (ga) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory C. Fox.(ga) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 05/29/2019. Order to Superintendent/Warden and a copy to plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Abeyance by Gregory C. Fox.(ao) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory C. Fox.(ga) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ga) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Accounting Assistant. (ga) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Application To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (ga) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCOVERY filed by Gregory C. Fox. (ao) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDMENT by Gregory C. Fox. (ao) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Noted new address on envelope and updated docket. (ao) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Stay by Gregory C. Fox.(ao) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(ao) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 04/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (CIVIL RIGHTS))(lp) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01378. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE FORTHWITH TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTERICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/8/19. 4/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LACCAWANNA COUNTY, ROBERT MALINOWSKI, OWENS, TERRI SOMER (NO FEE, NO IFP), filed by GREGORY C. FOX. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CO Owen is a litigant

Latest cases where Lackawanna County DA is a litigant