This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 20:45:53 (UTC).

Michael Fox v. The Home Depot, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Michael Fox filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against The Home Depot, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02127

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Fox

Defendants

Graco Inc.

The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

The Home Depot, Inc.

Doe

Does 2 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter R Afrasiabi

One Llp, East Tower, 4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Steven Michael Dicterow

One Llp, East Tower, 4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Jonathan Oldham Ballard

One Llp, 9301 Wilshire Boulevard Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Ali R Mirhosseini

Attorney at Mirhosseini and Associates

1502 North Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Defendant Attorneys

Kelsey Leigh Anne Maxwell

Attorney at Murchison and Cumming LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Agneles, CA 90017

Taline Gina Bazaz

Attorney at Murchison and Cummning LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Shawn M Raiter

Attorney at Larson and King LLP

30 East 7Th Street Suite 2800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Scott L Hengesbach

Attorney at Murchison and Cumming LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4624

Robert Kenneth Dixon

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Vickie E Turner

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#37

#36

35 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order

#35

#34

#4

3 #1

Exhibit Ntc to Adverse Party

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit Remainder of State Court Action

1 #3

Exhibit Ntc of Filing with State Court

1 #2

Exhibit CT Service of Process

1 #1

Exhibit Summons & Complaint

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-190) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, this case is transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-2127 FLA (DFMx). (mrgo) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #39 Non-Resident Attorney Shawn M. Raiter APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Graco Inc, designating Scott L Hengesbach as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Shawn M. Raiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Graco Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29683983) #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notices; Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) First REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Shawn M. Raiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Graco Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29683983) filed by Graco Inc. Graco Inc.. Request set for hearing on 1/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. Counsel is ordered to lodge a proposed order re: Application for Pro Hac Vice #34 no later than 12/24/2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Pro Hac Vice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re Stipulation for Protective Order #35 . [See document for details.] (et) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Michael Fox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Afrasiabi, Peter) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant Graco Inc. (Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Revised Proposed Trial Dates and Deadlines #29 . ( Discovery cut-off 7/7/2021., Final Motions due by 11/1/2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2021 before David O. Carter., Jury Trial set for 12/7/2021 before David O. Carter )SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to fictitious name of Doe 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Michael Fox. Filed in State Court on 9/17/2020 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Graco Inc., The Home Depot, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Michael Fox. Filed in State Court on 9/17/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelsey Leigh Anne Maxwell counsel for Defendant Graco Inc.. Adding Gina Bazaz as counsel of record for Graco Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Graco Inc.. (Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kelsey Leigh Anne Maxwell on behalf of Defendant Graco Inc. (Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Graco Inc., (Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Graco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ntc to Adverse Party)(Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Graco Inc.. (Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2020-01160788-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28850122 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Graco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit CT Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Ntc of Filing with State Court, #4 Exhibit Remainder of State Court Action) (Attorney Kelsey Leigh Anne Maxwell added to party Graco Inc.(pty:dft))(Maxwell, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRACO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott L Hengesbach

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Kenneth Dixon