This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 08:04:16 (UTC).

Fox v. Geico Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Fox filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Geico Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Fox

Defendants

Geico Insurance

Geico General Insurance

Government Employees

GEICO Direct

GEICO Casualty

GEICO Idemnity Insurance

Geico Insurance Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Woods

Attorney at WOODS LAW PLLC

2972 W Maple Loop Drive Suite 301G

Lehi, UT 84043

Mark T. Flickinger

Attorney at FLICKINGER SUTTERFIELD & BOULTON

3000 N University Ave Ste 300

Provo, UT 84604

Defendant Attorneys

Peter H. Christensen

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Marshall J. Hendrickson

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Ryan M. Stephens

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendants Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil File Cover Seet

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 In Support of Notice of Removal

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 In Support of Notice of Removal

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a schedule to Defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utahs website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within fourteen (14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/11/2022. (jl) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Defendant Geico Casualty Co,'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. (Stephens, Ryan) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Tyler Fox, Defendants Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. (nl) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Tyler Fox, Defendants Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. Form due by 8/16/2022. (alf) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Woods on behalf of Tyler Fox (Woods, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order PDF of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/19/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Dispositive or Potentially Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/23/22. (dla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/19/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Dispositive or Potentially Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/23/22. (dla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docket(#12) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 8/22/22. (dla) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PDF of Proposed Order)(Flickinger, Mark) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Docket(#10) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Docket(#9) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Tyler Fox. (alf) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Docket(#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. (alf) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Woods on behalf of Tyler Fox (Woods, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Tyler Fox, Defendants Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. Form due by 8/16/2022. (alf) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Tyler Fox, Defendants Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. (nl) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant Geico Casualty Co,'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. (Stephens, Ryan) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a schedule to Defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utahs website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within fourteen (14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/11/2022. (jl) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Salt Lake County, case number 220902611, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4386677) filed by Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil File Cover Seet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 In Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 In Support of Notice of Removal) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Stephens, Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendants Geico General Insurance, Geico Insurance, Geico Insurance Agency is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO Insurance Agency, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant