This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 09:52:48 (UTC).

Fox-Robertson v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Fox-Robertson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00844

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vicki Fox-Robertson

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clay R Zelbst

Attorney at Zelbst Holmes & Butler

P O Box 365, 411 Sw Sixth St

Lawton, OK 73502-0365

John P Zelbst

Attorney at Zelbst Holmes & Butler

P O Box 365, 411 Sw Sixth St

Lawton, OK 73502-0365

David L Butler

Attorney at Zelbst Holmes & Butler

P O Box 365, 411 Sw Sixth St

Lawton, OK 73502-0365

Chandra L Holmes

Attorney at John P Zelbst Law Firm

P O Box 365

Lawton, OK 73502-0365

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit Louis DeJoy - PMG - Washington DC - Proof of service

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Louis DeJoy - PMG - Washington DC - Proof of service)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit William Barr, Atty General - USA

#9

(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit William Barr, Atty General - USA)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Ruth Przybeck, General Counsel - Torts - USPS

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ruth Przybeck, General Counsel - Torts - USPS)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit Ronald Stroman, Dep PMG - USPS - Washington DC

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ronald Stroman, Dep PMG - USPS - Washington DC)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit Civil Process Clerk - US Atty - OKC

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Process Clerk - US Atty - OKC)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit USPS - Tort Claims Administrator - OKC

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS - Tort Claims Administrator - OKC)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit Timothy J. Downing - US Atty - OK

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Timothy J. Downing - US Atty - OK)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit Michael Allison - PM - OKC - Green Card

#3

(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael Allison - PM - OKC - Green Card)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to OKC Post Office Postmaster, U.S. Postal Service, Postmaster General, Deputy Postmaster General, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (em) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Louis DeJoy - PMG - Washington DC - Proof of service)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit William Barr, Atty General - USA)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ruth Przybeck, General Counsel - Torts - USPS)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ronald Stroman, Dep PMG - USPS - Washington DC)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Process Clerk - US Atty - OKC)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS - Tort Claims Administrator - OKC)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Timothy J. Downing - US Atty - OK)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael Allison - PM - OKC - Green Card)(Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to OKC Post Office Postmaster, U.S. Postal Service, Postmaster General, Deputy Postmaster General, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (em) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3240559. (Zelbst, Clay) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Vicki Fox-Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less