This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 09:02:37 (UTC).

Fox Ortega Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Nicholson

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Fox Ortega Enterprises, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Nicholson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04418

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael G. Kasolas

Defendant

Wayne Nicholson

Debtor In Possession

Fox Ortega Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Premier CRU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathy Bazoian Phelps

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

David Rosendorf

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd, 9Th Floor

Miami, FL 33134

David Allen Taylor

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jane Kim

Attorney at Keller and Benvenutti LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Thomas Bogdan Rupp

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

cover letter

#2

#3

3 #1

stipulation

3 #2

order

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #6 Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Appeal filed by Wayne Nicholson. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #4 Stipulation to Stay Appeal Pending Settlement.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2021) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Appeal Pending Settlement filed by Wayne Nicholson. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 6/16/2021) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Stipulation to Extend to File a Statement filed by Wayne Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 stipulation, #2 order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL & SCHEDULING ORDER: (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-40050 WJL. File received. Filed byWayne Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Lee Rosendorf

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jane Kim