Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2021 at 16:31:15 (UTC).

Fox et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Fox filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Ally Financial Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21478

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Preenon Huq

Defendants

Square Inc.

Trading 212 LTD.

Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC

Freetrade Ltd.

Barclays Bank P.L.C.

Robinhood Securities, LLC

E*Trade Securities LLC

Stash Financial, Inc.

Robinhood Financial LLC

Fumi Holdings, Inc.

WeBull Financial LLC

Ally Financial Inc.

Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC

Cash App Investing LLC

TD Ameritrade, Inc.

Interactive Brokers LLC

Dough LLC

The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation

Melvin Capital Management, LP

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A. Goodwin

Attorney at Gustafson Gluck, PLLC

650 Northstar East, 608 Second Avenue South

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street Ste 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel C. Hedlund

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Other Attorneys

Scott David Hirsch

Attorney at Scott Hirsch Law Group, PLLC

6810 North State Road 7, 33073

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott David Hirsch on behalf of Julie Fox. Attorney Scott David Hirsch added to party Julie Fox(pty:pla). (Hirsch, Scott) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga.(MMP) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Apex Clearing Corporation, Citadel Securities LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Barclays Bank PLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Webull Financial LLC. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Freetrade, LTD., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc.. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Dough LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Square Inc., eToro USA Securities, Inc.. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to all applicable parties in the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the party Preenon Huq. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (pcs) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#15) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Minnesota. Case Number 0:21-cv-00689 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21478-CMA on 4/16/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott David Hirsch on behalf of Julie Fox. Attorney Scott David Hirsch added to party Julie Fox(pty:pla). (Hirsch, Scott) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#13) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case transferred in from Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00689. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga.(MMP) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Scott D. Hirsch as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Apex Clearing Corporation, Citadel Securities LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Barclays Bank PLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Webull Financial LLC. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Freetrade, LTD., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc.. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Dough LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Square Inc., eToro USA Securities, Inc.. (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-689 (SRN/DTS). (KNK) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Apex Clearing Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, Dough LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Freetrade, LTD., Fumi Holdings, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Square Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Webull Financial LLC, eToro USA Securities, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8590570) filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goodwin, David) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dough, is a litigant

Latest cases where Stash Financial, Inc. is a litigant