This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/30/2022 at 13:57:08 (UTC).

Fowler v. DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Fowler filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00689

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shelley R Fowler

Defendants

DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance

Computer Sciences Corporation

Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus Lane Vaden

Attorney at The Marcus Vaden Law Firm

Post Office Box 203

Conway, AR 72033

Defendant Attorney

Sam Zurik, III

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance (Zurik, Sam) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #2 Motion for Extension of Time notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance (Zurik, Sam) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE. Corporate Creations Network as Agent for Service for DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance served on 8/23/2022. (Vaden, Marcus) (Docket text modified on 9/7/2022 to indicate the party served) (jak) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE. DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance served on 8/25/2022. (Vaden, Marcus) (Docket text modified on 9/7/2022 to correct the party served)(jak) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Shelley R Fowler(Vaden, Marcus) (Docket text modified on 9/28/2022 to correct description.)(cmn) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as, "AMENDED COMPLAINT against DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Shelley R Fowler" as indicated by the document. (cmn) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Shelley R Fowler(Vaden, Marcus) (Docket text modified on 9/28/2022 to correct description.)(cmn) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 and #7 Return of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance as marked on the documents. (jak) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE. DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance served on 8/25/2022. (Vaden, Marcus) (Docket text modified on 9/7/2022 to correct the party served)(jak) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE. Corporate Creations Network as Agent for Service for DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance served on 8/23/2022. (Vaden, Marcus) (Docket text modified on 9/7/2022 to indicate the party served) (jak) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance (Zurik, Sam) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #2 Motion for Extension of Time notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance answer or other responsive pleading due 9/27/2022. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/1/2022. (amr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance (Zurik, Sam) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued and returned to counsel for plaintiff as to DXC Technology Company (formerly Computer Sciences Corporation) Long Term Disability Plan Insurance. (jap) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS UNDER ERISA against DXC Technology Company Long Term Disability Plan Insurance filed by Shelley R Fowler. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT087726.) No summons issued. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less