This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 08:37:23 (UTC).

Foust v. Gobbel et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Foust filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gobbel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory B. Wormuth and Kevin R. Sweazea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00788

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Presiding Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Foust

Defendants

Daniel Gobbel

Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.

St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Damien Grueninger

Defendant Attorneys

Josh A. Harris

Ryan Thomas Saylor

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Daniel Gobbel, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Daniel Gobbel, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company All State Documents Filed (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#11

(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bryan Foust (Grueninger, Peter) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#12

(#12) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due December 20, 2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for January 3, 2023, at 3:00 PM. Counsel shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. (emm) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryan Foust Certifying Delivery of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Grueninger, Peter) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryan Foust Certifying Delivery of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Grueninger, Peter) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea Setting Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference to determine the scheduling and location of the trial and other significant pre-trial deadlines and hearings. Trial Scheduling Conference set for March 22, 2023 at 10:30 AM. The parties shall call (888) 398-2342 and enter code 8193818 to join the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (atc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due December 20, 2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for January 3, 2023, at 3:00 PM. Counsel shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. (emm) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bryan Foust (Grueninger, Peter) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Bryan Foust, 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Daniel Gobbel, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company All State Documents Filed (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Daniel Gobbel, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Bryan Foust voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Grueninger, Peter)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Saylor, Ryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8518868 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc. from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-503-cv-2022-00682. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saylor, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less