This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2020 at 17:54:40 (UTC).

Foust v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Foust filed an Other lawsuit against Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clarence Foust

Defendants

Comast Cable Communications, LLC

Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

Complete Recovery Corporation

Comcast Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ben Miller

Attorney at The Higgins Firm

525 4Th Ave S

Nashville, TN 37210

Defendant Attorneys

Donald Austin Gillis

Attorney at Moore, Ingram, Johnson & Steele, LLP(Georgia)

326 Roswell Street, Suite 100

Marietta, GA 30060

Charles E Pierce

Attorney at Moore Ingram Johnson & Steele, LLP

408 N. Cedar Bluff Road, Suite 500

Knoxville, TN 37923

Sean G Wieber

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP (IL)

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

William R Johnson

Attorney at Moore, Ingram, Johnson & Steele, LLP(Georgia)

326 Roswell Street, Suite 100

Marietta, GA 30060

Kevin P Simpson

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

 

Court Documents

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#36

#31

#13

6 #1

Other Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Initial Discovery

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#1

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE by Comcast Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Gillis, Donald) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ORDER accepting and adopting #58 Report and Recommendations ; granting #31 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendations is OVERRULED. Parties shall have 45 days to engage in limited discovery on whether a valid arbitration agreement exists. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/13/2020. (AML) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) OBJECTION to #58 Report and Recommendations, filed by Clarence Foust. (Miller, Ben) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendants Motion #31 requesting limited discovery relating to whether the parties agreed to arbitratebe GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 1/28/20. (ABF) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin: Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2019. The Court held a status conference regarding the Motion to Compel Discovery and to inquire whether the parties wish to participate in limited discovery. Argument heard by counsel. The Court will consult with the District Judge's chambers, and will take this matter under advisement. Order to follow. (RLK) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 1:30 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin. The parties will need to initiate the call and call into chambers at 865-545-4260.(RLK) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER finding as moot #36 Motion to Compel; finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #28 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on November 18, 2019. (SAC) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation Notice of Leave of Absence (Gillis, Donald) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #53 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Discovery Pending Decision Thereon, and Motion in the Alternative to Dismiss Non-Tennessee Putative Class Members filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Patel, #2 Exhibit A - Comcast Customer Privacy Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories)(Wieber, Sean) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Discovery Pending Decision Thereon, and Motion in the Alternative to Dismiss Non-Tennessee Putative Class Members by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Wieber, Sean) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting in part #6 Motion to Stay. Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/15/2019. (AML) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Gillis, Donald) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION to Stay Initial Case Deadlines by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Pierce, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/13/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/13/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/13/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Wieber. (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC)Notice mailed to Wieber. Modified on 5/15/2019, disregard Notice for Gillis. Attorney ECF database updated as to Gillis being admitted to EDTN in 2018. (SAC). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (SAC) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketDistrict Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 310319. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3970643), filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Initial Discovery, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal)(Pierce, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Complete Recovery Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ben Miller