This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2022 at 08:03:18 (UTC).

Fountains of Arlington HOA v. Insurance Company of Greater New York

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Fountains of Arlington HOA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Insurance Company of Greater New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05122

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fountains of Arlington HOA

Defendant

Insurance Company of Greater New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott David Green

Attorney at The Law Offices of Scott Green

P.O. Box 30016

Chicago, IL 60630

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew S. Ponzi

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

Matthew Ross Carlyon

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palendech Ponzi & Rudloff

222 N Lasalle Dr. #1400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Insurance Company of Greater New York by Matthew Ross Carlyon (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Insurance Company of Greater New York by Matthew S. Ponzi (Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#4

(#4) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (exr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fountains of Arlington HOA by Scott David Green (Green, Scott) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Webex Participant Instructions

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Insurance Company of Greater New York(Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Insurance Company of Greater New York (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Status hearing set for 10/19/2022 is reset for 11/7/2022 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a device with video capability, please use the dial in option: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. If you do have access to a device with video capability, you are directed to appear telephonically.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Insurance Company of Greater New York (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 11/7/2022 via Webex. The Court adopts briefing schedule as outlined in Joint Status Report #10 . Amendment of pleadings shall be filed by 11/30/2022. End of Fact Discovery ordered closed by 5/31/2023. End of Fact Discovery Status hearing set for 6/1/2023 at 9:00 AM. Disclosure of Plaintiff's experts and expert reports due by 6/30/2023; Disclosure of Defendant's expert and expert reports due by 8/15/2023. Expert Discovery ordered closed by 9/29/2023. Dispositive and/or Daubert Motions shall be filed by 12/6/2023; Responses due by 12/19/2023; Replies due by 1/12/2024. Parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy by 3/31/2023 to inform the Court if they are requesting a referral to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of a settlement conference. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 11/7/2022 via Webex. The Court adopts briefing schedule as outlined in Joint Status Report #10 . Amendment of pleadings shall be filed by 11/30/2022. End of Fact Discovery ordered closed by 5/31/2023. End of Fact Discovery Status hearing set for 6/1/2023 at 9:00 AM. Disclosure of Plaintiff's experts and expert reports due by 6/30/2023; Disclosure of Defendant's expert and expert reports due by 8/15/2023. Expert Discovery ordered closed by 9/29/2023. Dispositive and/or Daubert Motions shall be filed by 12/6/2023; Responses due by 12/19/2023; Replies due by 1/12/2024. Parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy by 3/31/2023 to inform the Court if they are requesting a referral to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of a settlement conference. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Insurance Company of Greater New York (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Status hearing set for 10/19/2022 is reset for 11/7/2022 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a device with video capability, please use the dial in option: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. If you do have access to a device with video capability, you are directed to appear telephonically.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Insurance Company of Greater New York (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Insurance Company of Greater New York(Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing set for 10/19/2022 at 9:15 AM which will proceed via Webex. Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2022. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Webex instructions are as follows: Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone and turn off your video until your case is called. If calling in due to not having access to a computer, please remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function. Please test the sound quality and video functions of your device in advance. Members of the public and media are directed to call in to listen to hearings. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Participant instructions for Webex are attached. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Webex Participant Instructions) (lk, ) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fountains of Arlington HOA by Scott David Green (Green, Scott) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (exr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Insurance Company of Greater New York by Matthew S. Ponzi (Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Insurance Company of Greater New York by Matthew Ross Carlyon (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2022L007494) filed by Insurance Company of Greater New York Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19860128. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Ponzi