This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2022 at 06:22:18 (UTC).

Fountain v. Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Fountain filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeremiah J. McCarthy and Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01000

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeremiah J. McCarthy

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIQUELLE FOUNTAIN

Defendants

Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC

Joseph Yoffee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aubrey Davis Hetznecker

Attorney at Schlather Stumbar Parks & Salk, LLP

200 East Buffalo Street, P.O. Box 353

Ithaca, NY 14851

Defendant Attorney

Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (NYC)

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Fact discovery to be completed by January 12, 2023. Dispositive motions due by June 15, 2023. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/27/2022. (EG) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

26 #2

Exhibit Joint Letter

26 #1

Affidavit Attorney Affirmation

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) Letter filed by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee Request for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#24

(#24) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Fact discovery to be completed by October 14, 2022. Dispositive motions due by March 15, 2023. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 7/11/2022. (EG) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#23

(#23) Letter MOTION for Extension of time to Complete Discovery filed by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee Requesting an Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) Converted to motion on 7/11/2022 (EG). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION (Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Order) by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#20

(#20) Mediation Certification by James E. Morris. The case has not settled mediation complete. (AGW) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC served on Secretary of State; Robert Guyette on 09/09/2021, filed by Miquelle Fountain. (Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

4 #1

Supplement Demand for Jury Trial

#4

(#4) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Miquelle Fountain. Amended Civil Cover Sheet filed by Miquelle Fountain. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Demand for Jury Trial)(Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee. (TMK) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

2 #3

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 of Complaint

2 #1

Supplement Summons Defendant Yoffee

#2

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Fact discovery to be completed by January 12, 2023. Dispositive motions due by June 15, 2023. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/27/2022. (EG) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) First MOTION to Adjourn remainder of case management order (fact discovery, etc.) , First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Miquelle Fountain. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation, #2 Exhibit Joint Letter)(Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: re #25 Letter - Attorney Action Required: refile the Letter using the Motion event and the relief of extension of time. (TMK) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Letter filed by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee Request for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Fact discovery to be completed by October 14, 2022. Dispositive motions due by March 15, 2023. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 7/11/2022. (EG) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Letter MOTION for Extension of time to Complete Discovery filed by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee Requesting an Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) Converted to motion on 7/11/2022 (EG). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) TEXT ORDER: The parties' Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement #21 is hereby SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 5/20/2022. (EG) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION (Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Order) by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Mediation Certification by James E. Morris. The case has not settled mediation complete. (AGW) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Miquelle Fountain. (Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Joseph Yoffee served on Joseph Yoffee on 09/09/2021, filed by Miquelle Fountain. (Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC served on Secretary of State; Robert Guyette on 09/09/2021, filed by Miquelle Fountain. (Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Miquelle Fountain. Amended Civil Cover Sheet filed by Miquelle Fountain. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Demand for Jury Trial)(Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC, Joseph Yoffee. (TMK) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: re #1 COMPLAINT against MIQUELLE FOUNTAIN - fixed the text (TMK) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by MIQUELLE FOUNTAIN. to #1 Complaint Summons, Exhibits, and Civil Cover Sheet filed by MIQUELLE FOUNTAIN. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Defendant Yoffee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of Complaint, #3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Hetznecker, Aubrey) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Red Lobster $ 402 receipt number 0209-4350622, filed by MIQUELLE FOUNTAIN.(Hetznecker, Aubrey) Modified on 9/7/2021 to fix text(TMK). (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo