This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 09:06:10 (UTC).

Fotohaus LLC v. Advanced Plan for Health LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Fotohaus LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Advanced Plan for Health LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02049

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fotohaus, LLC

Fotohaus LLC

Defendants

Advanced Plan for Health, LLC

Advanced Plan for Health LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James E Key

Attorney at Harris Finley & Bogle PC

777 Main St, Suite 1800

Fort Worth, TX 76102-5341

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen A Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Law PC

1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 2750

Dallas, TX 75202

Michelle Dawn Daniel

Attorney at Kennedy Law PC

1445 Ross Ave, Suite 2750

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Appendix

#12

(#12) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Advanced Plan for Health LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Advanced Plan for Health LLC answer due 9/25/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#10

(#10) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Advanced Plan for Health LLC (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen A Kennedy for Michelle D. Daniel on behalf of Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen A Kennedy on behalf of Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (hml) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#5

(#5) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (hml) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fotohaus, LLC. (Key, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Fotohaus, LLC. (Key, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Advanced Plan for Health LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Advanced Plan for Health LLC answer due 9/25/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Advanced Plan for Health LLC (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen A Kennedy for Michelle D. Daniel on behalf of Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen A Kennedy on behalf of Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kennedy, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Advanced Plan for Health LLC. (hml) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (hml) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fotohaus, LLC. (Key, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Fotohaus, LLC. (Key, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Advanced Plan for Health, LLC filed by Fotohaus, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11046032) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5) (Key, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fotohaus, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen A Kennedy