Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:17:17 (UTC).

Bradford Budd et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Bradford Budd filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and John F. Walter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06420

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Bradford Budd

Ramona Budd

Foster Wheeler, LLC

Defendants

Southern California Edison Company

C.W. Driver, Inc.

Torrance Refining Company LLC

Zurn Industries, LLC

Air and Liquid Systems Corp.

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Ultramar, Inc

The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California

Crane Co.

Does 1-10 (11-500 terminated)

McNally Industries, Inc.

Southwest Marine, Inc.

3M Company

Chevron USA Inc.

Crown Cork and Seal, Inc.

Elliott Company

City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel L Keller

Attorney at Keller Fishback and Jackson LLP

28720 Canwood Street Suite 200

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Petitioner Attorney

Charles S Park

Attorney at Hugo Parker LLP

240 Stockton Street 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

Suzanna Lianna Minasian

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield PLLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Glen R Powell

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Streeet 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marla Talina Almazan

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Bradford J DeJardin

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Joseph Duffy

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Rebecca Anne Bellow

Attorney at Berkes Crane Robinson and Seal LLP

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christina M Glezakos

Attorney at Hugo Parker LLP

240 Stockton Street 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Carmen Santana

Attorney at Berkes Crane Robinson and Seal LLP

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ovsanna Thomas

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield PLLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tsun-Chi Eric Sun

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield PLLP

2185 North California Boulevard Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Karen B Goldberg

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6546

Anthony Dean Brosamle

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Alexander Beau Giraldo

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Shayan Heidarzadeh

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield PLLP

2185 North California Boulevard Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Timothy Clark Tanner

Attorney at Larson O'Brien LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Anthony Kaniewski

Attorney at WFBM LLP

One City Boulevard West 5Th Floor

Orange, CA 92868-3677

Florence A McClain

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

333 Bush Street Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jamie Oehrle Norman

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

251 South Lake Avenue Suite 750

Pasadena, CA 91101

67 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#210

(#210) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven E Bledsoe counsel for Defendant World Oil Corp.. Robert C. O'Brien is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant World Oil Corp.. (Bledsoe, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#209

(#209) Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 8/23/19 (lc) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#208

(#208) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#207

(#207) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT by Judge John F. Walter. The Court grants Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application and REMANDS this action to Los Angeles Superior Court. The Court declines to award attorney fees or impose sanctions on Foster Wheeler or its counsel. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

172 #12

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand

172 #11

Supplement Certificate of Service

172 #9

Supplement Objections to Declaration of J. Thomas Schroppe

172 #7

Exhibit Exhibit E

172 #6

Exhibit Exhibit D

3 #1

Affidavit Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Park counsel for Movant Foster Wheeler, LLC. Adding Charles S. Park as counsel of record for Foster Wheeler LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

2 #1

Affidavit Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

1 #4

Affidavit OF SERVICE

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#2) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

309 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#210) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven E Bledsoe counsel for Defendant World Oil Corp.. Robert C. O'Brien is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant World Oil Corp.. (Bledsoe, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#209) Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 8/23/19 (lc) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#208) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#207) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT by Judge John F. Walter. The Court grants Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application and REMANDS this action to Los Angeles Superior Court. The Court declines to award attorney fees or impose sanctions on Foster Wheeler or its counsel. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#206) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REMANDING THIS MATTER TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. (Cappy, Rod) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#205) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 DEFENDANT BEAZER EAST, INC. FKA KOPPERS COMPANY, INC. NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REMANDING THIS MATTER TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by Defendant Beazer East, Inc.. (Goldberg, Karen) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#204) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #164 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#203) NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Remand filed by Defendant C.W. Driver, Inc.. (Chusid, Bruce) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#202) DECLARATION of Jamie O. Norman in compliance with local rules governing electronic filing filed by Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc.. (Norman, Jamie) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#201) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc., identifying Baltimore Aircoil Company, and Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc.. (Norman, Jamie) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Foster Wheeler LLC NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC, identifying Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Park counsel for Movant Foster Wheeler, LLC. Adding Charles S. Park as counsel of record for Foster Wheeler LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, Air and Liquid Systems Corp., Atlantic Richfield Company, BW IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, C.W. Driver, Inc., CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chevron USA Inc., City of Burbank Department of Water and Power, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Pasadena Department of Water and Power, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Crane Co., Crown Cork and Seal, Inc., Does, Elliott Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferguson Enterprises, LLC, Flowserve Corporation, Fluor Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC., General Electric Company, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, McNally Industries, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mueller Co. LLC, Parsons Government Services Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Southern California Edison Company, Southwest Marine, Inc., Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc., The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California, Torrance Refining Company LLC, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Valero Energy Corp., World Oil Corp. amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, document 1-1 #1 )(lh) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR, case number 19STCV18802 Receipt No: 0973-24142598 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit OF SERVICE) (Attorney Charles S Park added to party Foster Wheeler, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Park, Charles) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAE SYSTEMS SAN DIEGO SHIP REPAIR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ultramar Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MCNALLY INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant