This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 07:48:42 (UTC).

Foster v. Mori et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Foster filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mori. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00281

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dwight Aaron Foster

Defendants

Naoya Mori

Sompo America Insurance Company

Toyo USA, Inc.

ABC Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley Egenberg

Attorney at Egenberg, APLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2525

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Mason Cire Johnson

Attorney at Taylor Wellons Politz Duhe, APLC

8550 United Plaza Boulevard, Suite 101

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Charles J. Duhe, Jr.

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe- B.R.

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Suite 101

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint STATUS REPORT by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's Limited Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Dwight Aaron Foster. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/21/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sompo America Insurance Company.(Johnson, Mason) Modified on 6/20/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

12 #3

Proposed Pleading;

12 #2

Proposed Pleading;

12 #1

Attachment Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading

#12

(#12) MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's Limited Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

11 #1

Attachment

#11

(#11) Limited MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Egenberg, Bradley) Modified on 6/18/2019 (NLT). (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/21/2019) (ELW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #1 Attachment) (ELW). Modified on 6/21/2019 documents replaced and add as ordered by rec doc # 14(ELW). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#9

(#9) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Johnson, Mason) Modified on 6/5/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#8) Amending and Supplemental Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Dwight Aaron Foster.(Egenberg, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwight Aaron Foster. Sompo America Insurance Company served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwight Aaron Foster. Toyo USA, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

1 #4

Summons - Toyo

1 #3

Summons - Sompo

1 #2

Summons - Mori

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938236.), filed by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Mori, #3 Summons - Sompo, #4 Summons - Toyo)(Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Joint STATUS REPORT by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's Limited Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Dwight Aaron Foster. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/21/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sompo America Insurance Company.(Johnson, Mason) Modified on 6/20/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's Limited Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Limited MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Egenberg, Bradley) Modified on 6/18/2019 (NLT). (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/21/2019) (ELW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #1 Attachment) (ELW). Modified on 6/21/2019 documents replaced and add as ordered by rec doc # 14(ELW). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants ABC Insurance Company, Naoya Mori, Sompo America Insurance Company, and Toyo USA, Inc. are granted an extension of time of twenty-one (21) days, or until 6/25/2019, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Johnson, Mason) Modified on 6/5/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amending and Supplemental Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Dwight Aaron Foster.(Egenberg, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwight Aaron Foster. Sompo America Insurance Company served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwight Aaron Foster. Toyo USA, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/28/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendants Toyo U.S.A.,Inc. and Sompo America Insurance Company, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Naoya Mori, Sompo America Insurance Company, Toyo USA, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Attorney Bradley Egenberg regarding Ben Berman who is Co-Counsel for party Dwight Aaron Foster. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938236.), filed by Dwight Aaron Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Mori, #3 Summons - Sompo, #4 Summons - Toyo)(Egenberg, Bradley) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.