Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2021 at 09:54:35 (UTC).

Foster v. AmericanWest Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Foster filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmericanWest Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04207

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kassandra Foster

Defendant

AmericanWest Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon R. Falon

Attorney at Johnson, Janklow, Abdallah & Reiter, LLP

101 South Main Avenue, Suite 100, Po Box 2348

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-5933

Scott A. Abdallah

Attorney at Johnson, Janklow, Abdallah & Reiter, LLP

101 South Main Avenue, Suite 100, Po Box 2348

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-5933

Sara E. Show

Attorney at Johnson, Janklow, Abdallah & Reiter, LLP

101 South Main Avenue, Suite 100, Po Box 2348

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-5933

Defendant Attorney

Mark J. Arndt

Attorney at Evans Haigh & Hinton LLP

101 North Main Avenue, Suite 213, Po Box 2790

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2790

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Discovery Report re #6 Order for Discovery Report by Kassandra Foster. Related document: #6 Order for Discovery Report.(Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

6 #1

Letter to counsel

#6

(#6) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(DJP) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AmericanWest Insurance Company. (Arndt, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Arndt on behalf of AmericanWest Insurance Company. (Arndt, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Kassandra Foster. (Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

2 #2

AO85

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to AmericanWest Insurance Company. Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Accident Report

1 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3451868, in shell case on 12/23/2020 filed by Kassandra Foster on 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Accident Report) (DJP) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Discovery Report re #6 Order for Discovery Report by Kassandra Foster. Related document: #6 Order for Discovery Report.(Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(DJP) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AmericanWest Insurance Company. (Arndt, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Arndt on behalf of AmericanWest Insurance Company. (Arndt, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Kassandra Foster. (Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to AmericanWest Insurance Company. Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3451868, in shell case on 12/23/2020 filed by Kassandra Foster on 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Accident Report) (DJP) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara E. Show

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Abdallah