This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 10:54:28 (UTC).

Foster et al v. City of Albuquerque

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Foster filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Albuquerque. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen B. Molzen, Steven C. Yarbrough, Martha Vazquez and John F. Robbenhaar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Karen B. Molzen

John F. Robbenhaar

Presiding Judges

Steven C. Yarbrough

Martha Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Courtney Foster

Matthew Kiscaden

Defendant

City of Albuquerque

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Shannon L Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Adam C. Flores

Attorney at Kennedy, Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

James Walker Boyd

Attorney at Peifer Hanson & Mullins, PA

20 First Plaza, Suite 725

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Charles Robert Peifer

Attorney at Peifer, Hanson & Mullins, PA

Po Box 25245

Albuquerque, NM 87125-5245

Gregory D. Steinman

Attorney at Madison, Mroz, Steinman & Dekleva, P.A.

P.O. Box 25467

Albuquerque, NM 87125

Elizabeth Radosevich

Attorney at Peifer, Hanson & Mullins, PA

Po Box 25245

Albuquerque, NM 87125-5245

Robert E. Hanson

Attorney at Peifer, Hanson & Mullins, PA

Po Box 25245

Albuquerque, NM 87125-5245

Paul M. Cash

Attorney at Madison, Mroz, Steinman & Dekleva, P.A.

P.O. Box 25467

Albuquerque, NM 87125-5467

Kevin Ashley Morrow

Attorney at City of Albuquerque

Post Office Box 2248

Albuquerque, NM 87103

William C Madison

Attorney at Madison, Mroz, Steinman & Dekleva, P.A.

P.O. Box 25467

Albuquerque, NM 87125

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #1

Exhibit 1

#18

#17

#16

#15

#12

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Albuquerque Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement (Radosevich, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Courtney Foster, Matthew Kiscaden Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Courtney Foster, Matthew Kiscaden Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant City of Albuquerque (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Attorney Gregory D. Steinman; Paul M. Cash and William C Madison terminated., ORDER Granting #22 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Madison, Mroz, Steinman & Dekleva, P.A.'s) filed by City of Albuquerque by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Peifer, Hanson & Mullins, P.A. has entered its appearance on behalf of Defendant City of Albuquerque. The Court permits Madison, Mroz, Steinman & Dekleva, P.A. to withdraw. (smd) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Docket(#26) ORDER SETTING HEARING by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Phase One Discovery Status Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (smd) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Phase One Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Pre-certification Expert Witness List due by 9/23/2019. Defendant's Pre-certification Expert Witness List due by 10/23/2019. Pre-certification Discovery due by 11/13/2019. Pre-certification Motions due by 12/4/2019. (smd) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Courtney Foster, Matthew Kiscaden Plaintiffs' First Requests for Admission (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Clerk's Minutes for Rule 16 proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2019. (smd) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by City of Albuquerque Madison, Mroz, Steinman & Dekleva, P.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant City of Albuquerque (Cash, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Albuquerque (Peifer, Charles) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William C Madison on behalf of City of Albuquerque (Madison, William) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Docket(#6) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg*) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by City of Albuquerque re #1 Complaint Notice of Extension of Time for Defendant City of Albuquerque to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint for Unlawful Forfeiture (Morrow, Kevin) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Ashley Morrow on behalf of City of Albuquerque (Morrow, Kevin) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Kiscaden, Courtney Foster. All Defendants. (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued as to City of Albuquerque. (khs) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (khs) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6356361 re #1 Complaint filed by Courtney Foster, Matthew Kiscaden (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Unlawful Forfeiture against City of Albuquerque ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Matthew Kiscaden, Courtney Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon L. Kennedy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam C. Flores

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy