This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2022 at 08:28:56 (UTC).

Foss v. Household Finance Realty Corporation of Nevada et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 Foss filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Household Finance Realty Corporation of Nevada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01421

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Foss

Defendants

Household Finance Realty Corporation of Nevada

U.S. Bank National Association

Recontrust Company, N.A.

Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.

HSBC Finance Corporation

NewRez LLC

Ditech Financial LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin E Beck

Attorney at Beck Pingel

701 North Green Valley Parkway, Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Robert Lachman

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Melanie D Morgan

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Cir., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Ariel E. Stern

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Villagecenter Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Natalie L Winslow

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Paige Magaster

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Villagecenter Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE Notice of Settlement by NewRez LLC.. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#12

(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NewRez LLC.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#11

(#11) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NewRez LLC.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Recontrust Company, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A., Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Recontrust Company, N.A. added.. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Countrywide Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. added.. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

8 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Rescission of election to declare default

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of default/election to sell under deed of trust

8 #8

Main Document

7 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E - Substitution of trustee and full reconveyance

7 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Grant bargain sale deed

7 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Assignment of deed of trust to U.S. Bank National Associati

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Assignment of deed of trust to Household Finance Realty, et

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Deed of Trust

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit 1

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/31/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corporation for NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing added.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/17/2022. In light of the filing of #13 Notice of Settlement, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file settlement documents, stipulation for dismissal or joint status report within 60 days. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE Notice of Settlement by NewRez LLC.. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NewRez LLC.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NewRez LLC.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Recontrust Company, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A., Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Recontrust Company, N.A. added.. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Countrywide Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. added.. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINDER to #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Recontrust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of default/election to sell under deed of trust, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Rescission of election to declare default)(Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant NewRez LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Assignment of deed of trust to Household Finance Realty, etc., #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Assignment of deed of trust to U.S. Bank National Association, etc., #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Grant bargain sale deed, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Substitution of trustee and full reconveyance)(Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant NewRez LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/31/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corporation for NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing added.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-856349-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7032459) by NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Proof of service due by 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - All Pleadings in Case No. A-22-856349-C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of Natalie L. Winslow in Support of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Corporate Assignment of Deed of Trust) (Winslow, Natalie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less