This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:28:28 (UTC).

Foshee v. City Of Gilroy et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Foshee filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Of Gilroy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00132

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Foshee

Defendants

Robert Zuniga

City Of Gilroy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaime Alejandro Leanos

75 East Santa Clara Street, Suite 250

San Jose, CA 95113

Defendant Attorneys

Noah G. Blechman

Attorney at McNamara, Ney, Beatty, Slattery, Borges & Ambacher LLP

3480 Buskirk Avenue, Suite 250

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Drew Thomas Williams

Attorney at McNamara, Ney, Beatty, Slattery, Borges Amacher LLP

1211 Newell Avenue

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Foshee. Robert Zuniga served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. Standing Orders and Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Foshee.. (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of Gilroy, Robert Zuniga.. (Blechman, Noah) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against City Of Gilroy, Robert Zuniga ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14042238.). Filed byJoseph Foshee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Foshee. City Of Gilroy served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. Standing Orders and Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to City Of Gilroy. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Robert Zuniga. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint For Damages byCity Of Gilroy, Robert Zuniga. (Blechman, Noah) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint For Damages byCity Of Gilroy, Robert Zuniga. (Blechman, Noah) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of Gilroy, Robert Zuniga.. (Blechman, Noah) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Foshee.. (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Foshee. Robert Zuniga served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. Standing Orders and Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Foshee. City Of Gilroy served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. Standing Orders and Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Robert Zuniga. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to City Of Gilroy. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against City Of Gilroy, Robert Zuniga ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14042238.). Filed byJoseph Foshee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leanos, Jaime) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.