This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2022 at 21:44:38 (UTC).

Fortson et al v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Fortson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jared C. Bennett, Dustin B. Pead and Howard C. Nielson, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-MC-00588

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judges

Jared C. Bennett

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth V. Fortson

Petitioner

InMoment

Defendant

Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M. Destefano

11 W. Jefferson St., Ste. 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85003

J. Michael Malone

Attorney at HENDREN REDWINE & MALONE PLLC

4600 Marriott Dr., Ste. 150

Raleight, NC 27612

Jason Lanier Hendren

Attorney at HENDREN REDWINE & MALONE PLLC

4600 Marriott Dr., Ste. 150

Raleigh, NC 27612

John M. Destefano, III

Attorney at HAGENS BERMAN SOBOL SHAPIRO LLP

11 W Jefferson St Ste 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Kara H. North

3301 N University Ave

Provo, UT 84604

Robert B. Carey

Attorney at HAGENS BERMAN SOBOL SHAPIRO LLP

11 W Jefferson St Ste 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Kara H North

Attorney at JOHNSON LIVINGSTON PLLC

195 S Orem Blvd Ste 1

Orem, UT 84058

Petitioner Attorneys

George C. Chipev

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

555 Eleventh St, Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Marguerite M. Sullivan

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

555 Eleventh St, Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Matthew R. Lewis

Attorney at KUNZLER BEAN & ADAMSON

50 W Broadway Ste 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Jason R. Burt

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

555 Eleventh Street Nw Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant Attorneys

Rodger L. Eckelberry

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 Civic Center Dr. Ste. 2200

Columbus, OH 43215

Albert G. Lin

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 Civic Center Dr. Ste. 2200

Columbus, OH 43215

Andrea C. Wiltrout

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 Civic Center Dr. Ste. 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Kevin P. Zimmerman

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 Civic Center Dr. Ste. 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Martina T. Ellerbe

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 Civic Center Dr. Ste. 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Mathew G. Drocton

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 Civic Center Dr. Ste. 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Matthew B. Tynan

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

P.O. Box 260000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

Reid L. Phillips

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

Po Box 1800

Raleigh, NC 27602

Kimberly M. Marston

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD LLP

P.O. Box 260000

Greensboro,, NC 27420-6000

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Interdistrict Transfer to Middle District of North Carolina. Record transferred to receiving court electronically. All future documents should be filed in Middle District of North Carolina District Court. Case closed. (dla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#27

(#27) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff must file a copy of this Order in the Underlying Action within two calendar days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/12/22. (dla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Joinder to Response in Opposition to Non-Party CCC Intelligent Solutions Inc.'s Motion to Join Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Elizabeth V. Fortson (Destefano, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/23/2021. (jl) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Destefano, John) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

22 #3

Exhibit 5

22 #1

Exhibit Declaration of John M. DeStefano

#22

(#22) Redacted MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John M. DeStefano, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 5)(Destefano, John) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Marguerite M. Sullivan

3 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#3

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Declaration of Robert C. Levels in Support of Non-Party InMoment, Inc.'s S

2 #1

Exhibit A - Subpoena Duces Tecum

#2

#1

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to North Carolina Middle District via electronic given case number 1:22-cv-00024. (nl) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Interdistrict Transfer to Middle District of North Carolina. Record transferred to receiving court electronically. All future documents should be filed in Middle District of North Carolina District Court. Case closed. (dla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff must file a copy of this Order in the Underlying Action within two calendar days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/12/22. (dla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Joinder to Response in Opposition to Non-Party CCC Intelligent Solutions Inc.'s Motion to Join Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Elizabeth V. Fortson (Destefano, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/23/2021. (jl) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #23 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. FortsonNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John M. DeStefano, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Destefano, John) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Destefano, John) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Redacted MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John M. DeStefano, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 5)(Destefano, John) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/09/2021. (jl) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. FortsonNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lance Kaufman)(Destefano, John) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John DeStefano III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4139879,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Application)(North, Kara) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kara H. North on behalf of Elizabeth V. Fortson (North, Kara) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney George C. Chipev for InMoment.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/12/21. (dla) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marguerite M. Sullivan for InMoment.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/12/21. (dla) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 10/12/21. (dla) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George C. Chipev , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4134158,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Petitioner InMoment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of George C. Chipev)(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marguerite M. Sullivan , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4134152,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Petitioner InMoment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Marguerite M. Sullivan)(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Petitioner InMoment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Duces Tecum, #2 Declaration of Robert C. Levels in Support of Non-Party InMoment, Inc.'s Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Case Filing Fee for Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum received from Petitioner InMoment. (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AUTDC-4134108). (Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Petitioner InMoment is directed to E-File the Miscellaneous Case FIling Fee - Motion to Quash and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 49.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where InMoment is a litigant

Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin P. Zimmerman